Seo v. Johnson et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00171 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/24/2018
Complaint
2
07/24/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
07/24/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Summons Reissued (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/24/2018
Unissued Summons
4
10/17/2018
Notice of Appearance
5
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
6
10/19/2018
Summons Returned Executed
10/19/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
10/19/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
10
10/31/2018
Stay
11/05/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Clear Flags (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/01/2019
Stipulation
14
03/04/2019
Order on Stipulation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.