Seong Soo Kim and In Suk Kim
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00407 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/27/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/27/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
11/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/27/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
4
11/27/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
11/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
6
11/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/27/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/28/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
8
11/28/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
9
11/28/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
10
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
11/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
12/03/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
14
12/07/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.