Sequak et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00072 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
06/12/2018
Answer to Complaint
13
06/12/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
14
07/11/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
15
07/30/2018
Scheduling Order
16
10/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
17
01/22/2019
Notice of Change of Address
18
02/06/2019
Stipulation
19
02/08/2019
Order on Stipulation
20
02/12/2019
Order
21
04/01/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
22
04/05/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.