Sergio Mauricio Castano- Gil
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00244 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/30/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
07/30/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
07/30/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
07/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
07/31/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
07/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
07/31/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
08/01/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
08/03/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
15
08/06/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/07/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Final) (Use ONLY if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/29/2018
Amended Voluntary Petition
17
08/29/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
18
08/29/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
08/29/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/30/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.