Shala Maree George-Hollice
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00168 (alnb)

Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)

IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA SOUTHERN DIVISION IN RE:) CASE NO.: 18-00168-TOM13 SHALA MAREE GEORGE-HOLLICE) SS#: ###-##-2665))) DIRECTION FOR DEDUCTION TO: SIROTE & PERMUTT This Direction replaces any Direction you ATTN: PAYROLL DEPT. have previously received from the Trustee 2311 HIGHLAND AVE S, STE 500 regarding this Debtor. BIRMINGHAM, AL 35205-2973 the employer of the above-named Debtor. The Debtor named herein has filed a petition under Chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code, thereby subjecting his or her future earnings to the jurisdiction of the United States Bankruptcy Court until further notice. The Debtor has filed a written plan and the Bankruptcy Court has assumed jurisdiction over the Debtor's future earnings, which are no longer subject to levy or garnishment except continuing wage- withholding orders for current child support. The Debtor has requested or agreed to the issuance of this Direction to implement the proposed plan in this case, or the plan has been confirmed as provided by law. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1325(c), "After confirmation of a plan, the court may order any entity from whom the debtor receives income to pay all or any part of such income to the trustee." IT IS DIRECTED that, beginning immediately, the above-named Employer is directed to deduct from the Debtor's earnings, vacation pay, and bonuses, the sum of $87.00 BIWEEKLY and forward said deductions at least once each month to the Chapter 13 Trustee for this Court at: Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee Department SF 3 P.O. Box 830525 Birmingham, AL 35283-0525 The above named employer is hereby enjoined from imposing any type of penalty or taking any type of disciplinary action against the Employee-Debtor based on the issuance or effect of this Direction. It has been issued to implement the Debtor's voluntary Chapter 13 plan as authorized by the U.S. Bankruptcy Code. Any such discriminatory action is prohibited by 11 U.S.C. § 525. DATE: January 23, 2018 /s/ Bradford W. Caraway Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202-0848 Please include the Debtor's bankruptcy case number with any payment remitted to the Trustee's office. For information regarding this Direction for Deduction, please contact the Trustee's office via telephone (205) 323-4631, via fax (205) 252-0239, or via email info@ch13bham.com. PLEASE NOTIFY THE TRUSTEE'S OFFICE IF THIS DEBTOR LEAVES YOUR EMPLOYMENT SF Case 18-00168-TOM13 Doc 15 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:54:22 Desc Page 1 of 2 «user_initials» Case 18-00168-TOM13 Doc 15 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 11:54:22 Desc Page 2 of 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 268 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/15/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Shala Maree George-Hollice
2
01/15/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice.
3
01/15/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice
5
01/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice.
6
01/15/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice.
7
01/15/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice.
8
01/15/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice.
01/16/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice Case Number 09-03772, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/27/2009, Standard Discharge on 09/29/2009.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/16/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/07/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/26/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/16/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/09/2018.
10
01/16/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
01/17/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice).
12
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
13
01/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/18/2018.
14
01/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Shala Maree George-Hollice). Notice Date 01/19/2018.
15
01/23/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.