Shana Juliana Bachman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00029 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/30/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
01/30/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
01/30/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
01/30/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
4
01/30/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
5
01/30/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/30/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/30/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/31/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
10
01/31/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
01/31/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
16
02/12/2019
Request for Special Notice
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/12/2019
Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)
18
03/12/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
19
03/12/2019
Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.