Shannon Owens
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-82336 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
08/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
14
08/21/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing
10/02/2018
Hearing Scheduled (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
10/05/2018
Dismiss Case - Other
39
10/15/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.