Shantell Lanay Curry
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01878 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 245 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/03/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Fee Amount $310 Filed by Shantell Lanay Curry
2
05/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Shantell Lanay Curry.
4
05/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Shantell Lanay Curry.
5
05/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Shantell Lanay Curry.
05/03/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)(18-01878-13) [misc,volp13] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22029897. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
05/03/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 Tax Transcript Filed by Debtor Shantell Lanay Curry.
7
05/03/2018
Supplemental Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 3015-1(c) Filed by Debtor Shantell Lanay Curry (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
8
05/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/06/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 07/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 07/12/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/30/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 08/06/2018.
9
05/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
05/04/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Shantell Lanay Curry Case Number 14-01283, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/02/2014, Standard Discharge on 07/08/2014.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
05/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 05/05/2018.
11
05/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/06/2018.
12
05/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Shantell Lanay Curry). Notice Date 05/06/2018.
13
05/07/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
14
06/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 6/6/2018. (Ch13troffice, jc)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.