Sharon Marie Jolly
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00144 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
05/22/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/22/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
doc
05/22/2018
Certificate of Service
doc
05/25/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
05/25/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
06/05/2018
Entry of Appearance
24
06/05/2018
Undeliverable Mail
25
06/05/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
26
06/05/2018
Stay
27
06/05/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
28
06/06/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
06/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
06/07/2018
Certificate of Service
30
06/07/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
31
06/07/2018
Declaration
32
06/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
33
06/11/2018
Reassigning Judge (SA)
34
06/12/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)
35
06/12/2018
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
36
06/12/2018
Affidavit
37
06/12/2018
Certificate of Service
06/12/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
06/12/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
39
06/12/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
06/13/2018
Calendar Remark (Matter Continued / Rescheduled) (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
06/13/2018
Hearing
41
06/13/2018
Certificate of Service
42
06/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
06/14/2018
Letter
44
06/14/2018
Certificate of Service
45
06/14/2018
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
06/15/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
06/18/2018
Support Documentation
47
06/21/2018
Proceeding Memo
48
06/21/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
49
06/27/2018
Declaration
50
07/09/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
51
07/09/2018
Generic Motion / Application
52
07/11/2018
Hearing
07/11/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Update Deadline (Satisfy or Set Hearings) (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
07/16/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
54
07/16/2018
Generic Motion / Application
55
07/16/2018
Vacate
56
07/19/2018
Errata
57
07/19/2018
Undeliverable Mail
07/19/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
59
07/20/2018
Proceeding Memo
60
07/20/2018
Relief from Stay
61
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.