Sharon Marie Kazem
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00391 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
11/06/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/07/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/07/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)
4
11/07/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
5
11/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
11/07/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
8
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
11/13/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
11/20/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
13
11/20/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
14
11/20/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
15
11/20/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
16
11/20/2018
Certificate of Service
17
11/20/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
18
11/20/2018
Affidavit of Service
11/21/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
12/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
20
12/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
21
12/20/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
12/20/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
12/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/07/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
24
01/09/2019
Proceeding Memo
25
01/10/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
26
01/10/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
27
01/15/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
01/23/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
01/23/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
29
01/23/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
01/23/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.