Sharon Michelle Voran
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00111 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/10/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
04/10/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
04/10/2019
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
04/10/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
04/11/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
8
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
04/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
04/18/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
12
04/18/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
13
04/19/2019
Request for Special Notice
14
04/19/2019
Setting Hearing (SA)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.