Shawn Donovan Palazzotto
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00080 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
1
03/15/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Shawn Donovan Palazzotto
21
11/08/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
22
02/21/2019
Notice of Transfer / Assignment of Claim - With or Without Waiver (Fee) (BNC Notice)
02/21/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
Transfer of Claim Flag Removed After QC (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/21/2019
Transfer of Claim Fee Paid (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/23/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Transfer of Claims

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.