Shawn Michael Belotti and Teresa Ann Belotti
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00219 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
07/12/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
07/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
07/12/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
07/12/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
5
07/12/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
6
07/12/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
7
07/12/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
07/12/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
QC Remark Re: Official Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
07/12/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
14
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
15
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
16
07/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
17
07/26/2018
Notice to Individual Consumer Debtors (Form B201)
18
07/26/2018
Schedules A-J
19
07/26/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
20
07/26/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
07/27/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
08/06/2018
Entry of Appearance
08/06/2018
Case Selected for Audit (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
09/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
23
09/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
24
10/04/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
25
10/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
10/17/2018
Defer Entry of Discharge (Do Not Use to Extend Discharge or Dischargeability Deadline)
27
10/17/2018
Extend Entry of Discharge
28
10/24/2018
Auditors Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.