Shawyn Coleen Callahan
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00431 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 75 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/20/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Filed by Shawyn Coleen Callahan
1
Original Matrix at Case Opening #
2
Summary and Schedules A - J #
3
Statement of Financial Affairs #
4
Statement of Intent #
5
Payment Advices #
6
Means Test) (LD
6 Attachments
2
12/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling. Filed by Shawyn Coleen Callahan.
3
12/20/2018
Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived. Filed by Shawyn Coleen Callahan.
12/20/2018
Social Security Numbers, Tax IDs or EINs have been reviewed with the petition and Official Form 121 when required. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/20/2018
Petition Review Completed. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings
DebtorCase NoNote
Shawyn Coleen Callahan11-00223Ch7 filed in Alaska on 03/24/2011, Standard Discharge on 07/26/2011 (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/21/2018
Pursuant to 11 USC Section 701 and FRBP 2008, the bankruptcy trustee named is appointed trustee of the estate to serve under the trustee's blanket bond. The appointment is effective the date of this notice. Gary W. Dyer, Assistant US Trustee. (Nacole M. Jipping(7) is appointed.) Filed by US Trustee. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7). Filed by US Trustee.
6
12/21/2018
Court's Notice Regarding No Asset Chapter 7 (individual) Bankruptcy Filing, Notice of Meeting of Creditors,and Setting of Dates. 341 Meeting set for 1/28/2019 at 10:45 AM at Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. Objections to Discharge or Dischargeability due by 3/29/2019.Financial Management Course Certificate due by 3/29/2019.Financial Management reminder notice to be entered after 3/14/2019. Filed by US Trustee.
7
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor. (RE: DE#4 Notice of Debtor Duties Ch 7). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2018.
8
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion. (RE: DE#5 Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss). No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 12/23/2018.
9
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: DE#6 Meeting of Creditors Ch 7). No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 12/23/2018.
10
12/31/2018
Order Denying Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived, And Setting Deadline For Payment of Fee. First Installment Payment of $84.00 due by 1/24/2019. Second Installment Payment of $84.00 due by 2/21/2019. Third Installment Payment of $84.00 due by 3/21/2019. Final Installment Payment of $83.00 due by 4/18/2019. (Related Doc # 3)
11
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice. (RE: DE#10 Order on Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived). No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/02/2019.
12
01/08/2019
Notice of Rescheduling of the Section 341 Meeting of Creditors.
1
Matrix Used for Service) (RE: DE#
6
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7). Filed by Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Jipping(7), Nacole
2 Attachments
01/08/2019
TEXT ENTRY for 341 Meeting of Creditors held on 1/28/2019 at 10:45 AM, and then CONTINUED. Trustee comments (if any): Meeting is rescheduled on request of the Trustee 341 Meeting set for 1/31/2019 at 10:45 AM at Herbert A. Ross Historic Courtroom - Old Fed Bldg, Anchorage. (RE: DE#6 Meeting of Creditors Ch 7, 12 Generic Notice). Filed by Nacole M. Jipping(7).(Jipping(7), Nacole) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
01/14/2019
Personal Financial Management Course Certificate For Debtor.
02/25/2019
Receipt of SECOND Installment Payment. Receipt Number 24529, Fee Amount $85.00, rec'd on 2/25/19. PLEASE NOTE: All receipts are maintained by the Financial Deputy in the Bankruptcy Clerks Office. If you wish to view the receipt please contact the clerk. (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
OSCRef flag removed (RE: DE# OSC Referral, Receipt of Installment Payment). (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Receipt of SECOND Installment Payment. Receipt Number 24529, Fee Amount $85.00, rec'd on 2/25/19. PLEASE NOTE: All receipts are maintained by the Financial Deputy in the Bankruptcy Clerks Office. If you wish to view the receipt please contact the clerk. (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
OSCRef flag removed (RE: DE# OSC Referral, Receipt of Installment Payment). (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/24/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/25/2019
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.