Sheakley v. State of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00278 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/28/2018
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
2
11/28/2018
Unissued Summons
3
12/14/2018
Order
12/18/2018
Telephonic Notice of Appointed Counsel (For Appeal) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/27/2018
Notice of Appearance
5
01/17/2019
Continue
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/12/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
8
02/12/2019
Notice (Other)
9
02/13/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
10
03/19/2019
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
03/19/2019
Docket Annotation re Amended Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
04/16/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
12
04/25/2019
Dismiss
04/29/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/29/2019
Order on Motion to Dismiss (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/30/2019
Notice of Appearance
05/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
04/30/2019
Extension of Time to File Answer
16
04/30/2019
Dismiss
18
05/17/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.