Sheena L. Stricker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00278 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/27/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
08/27/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/27/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/27/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
4
08/27/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
08/28/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/28/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
8
08/28/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
08/28/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
08/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
09/19/2018
Entry of Appearance
09/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/02/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
10/17/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
10/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/17/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
17
10/17/2018
Certificate of Service
10/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/18/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
19
10/19/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
11/06/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
11/08/2018
Certificate of No Objection
21
11/20/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
22
11/20/2018
Relief from Stay
23
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
24
11/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/13/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.