Sheila Christine Faigle and Jesse Ward Faigle
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00379 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
10/30/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
10/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
10/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
5
10/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
10/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/30/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
7
10/31/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
10/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
11/02/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
14
11/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
15
11/19/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
12/01/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/01/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
12/10/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
01/25/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
19
01/28/2019
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
20
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
02/14/2019
Proceeding Memo
22
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
23
02/15/2019
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
24
02/15/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
02/15/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
26
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
02/19/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.