Shelly R. Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00186 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/18/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
06/18/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/18/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
6
06/20/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
06/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
10
06/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
06/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/02/2018
Extend Time
12
07/02/2018
Declaration
13
07/03/2018
Extend Time
14
07/06/2018
Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec)
15
07/06/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
16
07/06/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
17
07/06/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
18
07/06/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
19
07/06/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
07/09/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
08/27/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
21
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
22
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
23
09/11/2018
Final Notice of Intent to Close Case Without Discharge - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
24
09/12/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
25
09/13/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
26
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
09/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
28
09/20/2018
Notice Request
09/20/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
09/20/2018
Notice Request
09/20/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.