Sherri Dow
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2014-bk-00043 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
73
06/27/2018
Hearing
74
07/18/2018
Proceeding Memo
75
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
76
07/19/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
08/03/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
78
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
79
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
08/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.