Sheryl c Reed
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00290 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/24/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Sheryl C Reed
2
01/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.
3
01/24/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed
5
01/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.
6
01/24/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.
7
01/24/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.
8
01/24/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/05/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/04/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/23/2018.
9
01/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
01/25/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Sheryl C Reed Case Number 11-04871, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/27/2011, Standard Discharge on 07/01/2016; Case Number 02-07247, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 09/13/2002, Standard Discharge on 07/12/2007.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
01/25/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed).
11
01/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/27/2018.
12
01/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/27/2018.
13
01/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed). Notice Date 01/27/2018.
14
01/29/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
15
02/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 2/21/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
16
02/26/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
17
02/26/2018
Trustee Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions. (Ch13troffice, ul)
18
02/26/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 17 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions). Hearing scheduled 4/5/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
19
02/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/28/2018.
20
03/16/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.
21
04/06/2018
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/5/2018 11:21:15 AM ]. File Size [ 456 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:16 ]. (RE: Doc #16; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). (adiuser).
22
04/06/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.).
23
04/06/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.
24
04/06/2018
Order and Notice of Hearing Signed on 4/6/2018 (RE: related document(s) 17 Trustee's Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions Sustained and anyclaim of exemption that exceeds the amount allowed by applicable law is Disallowed. The following matters are continued: 8 Confirmation Hearing), 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 4/26/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
25
04/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order and Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 04/08/2018.
26
04/10/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
04/12/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 232.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00290-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (232.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21951539. Fee Amount 232.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
04/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed (RE: related document(s) 22 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed.).).
28
04/20/2018
Trustee's Withdrawal of Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway (RE: related document(s) 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss.). (Ch13troffice, ul)
29
04/24/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
30
04/26/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 4/26/2018. The Trustees objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing), 16 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 27 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Sheryl C Reed).
31
04/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 04/28/2018.
05/10/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 77.50 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00290-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (77.50) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22054201. Fee Amount 77.50 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
05/11/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 10 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.