Simpson v. Alaska Housing Finance Corp (AHFC)
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-ap-90029 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/12/2018
Complaint (Used in Open AP Case)
09/12/2018
Adversary Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
09/12/2018
Summons Issued
3
10/12/2018
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (CM15)
4
10/12/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
5
10/12/2018
Certificate of Service
6
10/16/2018
Certificate of Service
7
10/22/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
8
10/22/2018
Certificate of Service
9
10/22/2018
Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)
10/24/2018
Update Deadline (Objections - all types) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
11/05/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
11
11/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
12
11/15/2018
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
11/15/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/15/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
11/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
14
11/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
11/26/2018
Amended Complaint
12/07/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
12/14/2018
Entry of Default
17
12/14/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
18
12/14/2018
Support Documentation
19
12/17/2018
Affidavit
20
12/18/2018
Comply (SA)
12/18/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
12/19/2018
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (CM15)
22
12/20/2018
Hearing
23
12/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
24
12/21/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
12/21/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/21/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
12/21/2018
Document Served Conventionally (Notes Service Through the Mail) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
12/28/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
29
12/28/2018
Certificate of Service
01/02/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
01/04/2019
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
31
01/04/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
32
01/23/2019
Support Documentation
33
01/28/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing (SA)
01/28/2019
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
01/30/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
35
02/07/2019
Proceeding Memo
36
02/08/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
37
02/15/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
38
02/15/2019
Proceeding Memo

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.