Sims v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Arkansas

4:2013-cv-00371 (ared)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 473 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/24/2013
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alexandra Sims against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Fee of $400 paid. (RECEIPT #LIT040530). Summons issued and returned to counsel.
1
Civil Cover Sheet.)(vjt
1 Attachment
2
07/23/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexandra Sims. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/5/2013., AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, filed by Alexandra Sims. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/5/2013.
1
Exhibit 1, letter for service of process
2
Exhibit 2, green card
3
Exhibit 3, summons as served
3 Attachments
3
07/26/2013
Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company's ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit Certified Policy
1 Attachment
4
07/31/2013
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/3/2013; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/17/2013; proposed jury trial date the week of 6/23/2014 in Little Rock. Signed at the direction of the Court.
5
08/06/2013
MOTION for Order Certifying Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court by Alexandra Sims
6
08/06/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 5 Motion for Order Certifying Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court filed by Alexandra Sims.
7
08/16/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 5 Motion for Order (supplemental) filed by Alexandra Sims.
1
Exhibit 1, slip opinion dated 8/16/13
1 Attachment
8
08/19/2013
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Dale Phillips on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
9
08/20/2013
RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION for Order Certifying Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
10
08/20/2013
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 9 Response to Motion Certifying Question to Ark Sup Court filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
11
08/27/2013
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court, MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court () by Alexandra Sims
12
09/04/2013
Second MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court by Alexandra Sims
1
Exhibit 1, proposed reply brief
2
Exhibit 2, Saline County order granting motion to dismiss
3
Exhibit 3, Pulaski County order denying motion to dismiss
4
Exhibit 4, W.D. Ark. order denying motion to dismiss dated 8/26/13
4 Attachments
13
09/05/2013
ORDER granting pltf's Motion fo Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Certify Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court 11 12 ; Sims must file her reply brief within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/5/13.
14
09/05/2013
REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION for Order Certifying Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court filed by Alexandra Sims.
1
Exhibit 1, Saline County order granting motion to dismiss
2
Exhibit 2, Pulaski County order denying motion to dismiss
3
Exhibit 3, W.D. Ark. order denying motion to dismiss dated 8/26/13
3 Attachments
15
09/12/2013
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
16
09/12/2013
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for the week of 6/23/2014 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes; Discovery due by 4/10/2014; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 6/3/2014; Status Report due by 4/24/2014. Signed at the direction of the Court.
17
09/18/2013
ORDER denying pltf's 5 Motion to Certify Question to the Arkansas Supreme Court. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/18/13.
18
10/08/2013
Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed-To Protective Order) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit Agreed Protective Order
1 Attachment
19
10/17/2013
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 18. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/17/13.
20
01/20/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald P. Chaney, Jr on behalf of Alexandra Sims (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2014: # 1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 1/21/2014))
21
01/21/2014
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that 20 Notice of Appearance lacks a certificate showing service of the document on all parties (F.R.Cv.P.5(d)(1)).
22
03/24/2014
MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery () by Alexandra Sims
1
Exhibit 1, State Farm's answers to interrogatories and requests for production
2
Exhibit 2, Watkins index
3
Exhibit 3, Barten order
4
Exhibit 4, Chauvin order
5
Exhibit 5, Leonard order
6
Exhibit 6, Cusamanos order
7
Exhibit 7, Emon order #1
8
Exhibit 8, Emon order #2
9
Exhibit 9, Emon order #3
10
Exhibit 10, Hill order
11
Exhibit 11, State Farm Arkansas case table
12
Exhibit 12, State Farm Arkansas case list
13
Exhibit 13, Miller declaration
13 Attachments
23
03/24/2014
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 22 Motion to Compel, Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, filed by Alexandra Sims.
24
03/27/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Cullen on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
25
03/31/2014
MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Troy Sims, Becky Sims
26
03/31/2014
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 25 Motion to Quash filed by Becky Sims, Troy Sims.
27
04/03/2014
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial and Discovery Deadlines by Alexandra Sims
28
04/04/2014
ORDER granting 27 Motion to Continue. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 04/04/2014.
29
04/07/2014
RESPONSE to Motion re 22 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit Document List
2
Exhibit Relevant portions of claim file
3
Exhibit Affidavit of Bill Mills
4
Exhibit Affidavit of Jerri Golden
4 Attachments
30
04/07/2014
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 29 Response to Motion, to Compel filed by Plaintiff filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
31
04/30/2014
OPINION ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 22 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying as moot 25 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/30/2014.
32
07/15/2014
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for the week of 5/18/2015 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes; Discovery due by 3/5/2015; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 4/28/2015; Status Report due by 3/19/2015. Signed at the direction of the Court.
33
01/09/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
34
01/09/2015
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for defendant to respond is extended up to and including Friday, January 16, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/2015.
35
03/05/2015
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents before April 2, 2015, MOTION for Sanctions for Failure to Attend Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition and Violation of the Court's April 30, 2014 Discovery Order, MOTION to Deem Admitted () by Alexandra Sims
1
Exhibit A, certificate of nonattendance
2
Exhibit B, responses to third requests for production
3
Exhibit C-1, documents 700-714
4
Exhibit C-2, documents 715-730
5
Exhibit D, Hassoldt deposition documents
6
Exhibit E, correspondence between counsel
7
Exhibit F, responses to requests for admission
7 Attachments
36
03/05/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 35 Motion to Compel, Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Deem Admitted, filed by Alexandra Sims.
37
03/11/2015
MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum in Civil Case by Scott Harter
38
03/16/2015
MOTION to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
39
03/17/2015
ORDER granting 38 Motion to Extend Time. The motion deadline is hereby extended up to and including April 8, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/17/2015.
40
03/19/2015
STATUS REPORT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
41
03/19/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 35 Motion to Compel, Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Deem Admitted, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
42
03/20/2015
MOTION to Extend Time by Alexandra Sims
43
03/23/2015
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff must file her status report on March 23, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/2015.
44
03/23/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 37 MOTION to Quash filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
45
03/23/2015
RESPONSE in Support re 37 MOTION to Quash filed by Alexandra Sims.
1
Exhibit A, state court motion
2
Exhibit B, treating physician Perrymore report
3
Exhibit C, bill from Harter/Perrymore clinic
4
Exhibit D, Sayes brief from state court case
4 Attachments
46
03/23/2015
STATUS REPORT by Alexandra Sims.
47
03/24/2015
ORDER referring the matter of a settlement conference to United States Magistrate Judge Beth Deere for further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/24/2015.
48
03/25/2015
NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 4/13/2015 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 1D before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere.
49
03/26/2015
ORDER denying 35 Motion. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/26/2015.
50
03/26/2015
ORDER granting 37 Motion to Quash. Dr. Harter cannot be compelled to give expert testimony through a subpoena, nor can the Court require him to agree to be retained in this action to testify for the defense. He will not be required to attend the deposition on April 1, 2015. Alexandra Sims' response in support of Dr. Harter's motion to quash essentially is a motion in limine and will be treated as such by the Court. State Farm must respond to the arguments stated by Sims in her response, 45, within fourteen days from the date that the response was filed. If Sims wishes to file a reply, she may do so within seven days after State Farm's response is filed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/26/2015.
51
04/06/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Quash filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
52
04/08/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
53
04/08/2015
ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The motion deadline is hereby extended up to and including April 10, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/8/2015.
54
04/10/2015
MOTION for Summary Judgment by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
5 Attachments
55
04/10/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 54 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
56
04/10/2015
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re 54 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
58
04/10/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 57 Motion to Exclude Expert Minton filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
59
04/13/2015
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Beth Deere:Settlement Conference held on 4/13/2015. The parties negotiated but were unable to reach a settlement agreement. For plaintiff: Don Chaney Jr. and Nathan Chaney; for Defendant: Sarah Cullen. (CRD S. Flippen)
60
04/24/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 57 MOTION to Exclude Expert Minton by Alexandra Sims
61
04/27/2015
ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The time within which Sims must file her responses is extended up to and including May 7, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/27/2015. (ks)(Docket text modified on 4/27/2015 to correct a typographical error).
62
04/28/2015
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
63
04/28/2015
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Alexandra Sims.
1
Exhibit A, Exhibit List
2
Exhibit B, Witness list
2 Attachments
64
04/29/2015
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
65
05/04/2015
First MOTION in Limine by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
66
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 65 Motion in Limine filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
67
05/04/2015
MOTION in Limine by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
6
Exhibit
6 Attachments
68
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 67 Motion in Limine filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
69
05/04/2015
MOTION in Limine Impairment Rating by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
70
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 69 Motion in Limine Impairment Rating filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
71
05/04/2015
MOTION in Limine Chiari by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
5
Exhibit
5 Attachments
72
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 71 Motion in Limine Chiari filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
73
05/04/2015
MOTION in Limine Powerpoint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
74
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 73 Motion in Limine Powerpoint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
75
05/04/2015
MOTION in Limine Harshfield by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
4 Attachments
76
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 75 Motion in Limine Harshfield filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
77
05/04/2015
First MOTION in Limine by Alexandra Sims
78
05/04/2015
Second MOTION in Limine by Alexandra Sims
79
05/04/2015
MOTION in Limine concerning the foundation of certain documents by Alexandra Sims
1
Exhibit 1, Rogers deposition
2
Exhibit 2, Williams deposition excerpt
2 Attachments
80
05/04/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 79 Motion in Limine filed by Alexandra Sims.
81
05/06/2015
MOTION to Seal Document (responses to State Farm's motion for partial summary judgment, motion to exclude Justin Minton, and accompanying documents) by Alexandra Sims
82
05/06/2015
ORDER granting 81 Motion to Seal Document. Sims may file her responses under seal, and the time for doing so is extended up to and including May 11, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/6/2015.
83
05/11/2015
ADDENDUM filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company to 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Notice of Supplemental Authority
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
84
05/11/2015
SEALED Response.
85
05/11/2015
SEALED Response.
86
05/11/2015
SEALED Response.
87
05/12/2015
ORDER: The jury trial of this matter previously set for May 18, 2015, in Little Rock, Arkansas, is removed from the Courts docket. A new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/12/2015.
88
05/14/2015
MOTION to Clarify Deadlines, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 Order, 65 First MOTION in Limine, 73 MOTION in Limine Powerpoint, 69 MOTION in Limine Impairment Rating, 78 Second MOTION in Limine, 75 MOTION in Limine Harshfield, 79 MOTION in Limine concerning the foundation of certain documents, 67 MOTION in Limine, 71 MOTION in Limine Chiari, 77 First MOTION in Limine () by Alexandra Sims
89
05/15/2015
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Clarify or for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions in Limine. The time for responding to motions in limine will be extended up to and including 14 days after the Court enters an order ruling on defendant's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/15/2015.
90
05/18/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
91
05/18/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Exclude Expert Minton filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
92
06/09/2015
OPINION AND ORDER granting 54 Motion for Summary Judgment on Sims's bad faith and ADTPA claims. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/9/2015.
93
07/10/2015
ORDER: The jury trial of this matter is hereby rescheduled for sometime during the week of JANUARY 19, 2016, at 9:15 AM, in Courtroom #4-D, Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/10/2015.
94
07/23/2015
ORDER denying as moot 57 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/23/2015.
95
07/27/2015
ORDER: Responses to the pending motions in limine must be filed on or before September 9, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/2015.
96
09/08/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 77 First MOTION in Limine filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
97
09/08/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 78 Second MOTION in Limine filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
98
09/09/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 79 MOTION in Limine concerning the foundation of certain documents filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
99
09/09/2015
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 65 First MOTION in Limine, 73 MOTION in Limine Powerpoint, 69 MOTION in Limine Impairment Rating, 75 MOTION in Limine Harshfield, 67 MOTION in Limine, 71 MOTION in Limine Chiari by Alexandra Sims
100
09/15/2015
ORDER granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's response to the pending motions in limine due 9/18/2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/2015.
101
09/18/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 88 MOTION to Clarify Deadlines MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 Order, 65 First MOTION in Limine, 73 MOTION in Limine Powerpoint, 69 MOTION in Limine Impairment Rating, 78 Second MOTION in Limine, 75 filed by All Plaintiffs.
102
09/18/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 67 MOTION in Limine filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2015: #
3
Main Document - Correct and docket entry modified to correct the linkage) (thd
3 Attachments
103
09/18/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 81 MOTION to Seal Document (responses to State Farm's motion for partial summary judgment, motion to exclude Justin Minton, and accompanying documents) filed by All Plaintiffs.
104
09/18/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 69 MOTION in Limine filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2015: #
5
Main Document - Correct and docket entry modified on 9/21/2015 to correct the linkage.0 (thd
5 Attachments
105
09/18/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION in Limine Chiari filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
4
Exhibit
4 Attachments
106
09/18/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 65 First MOTION in Limine filed by All Plaintiffs.
1
Exhibit
1 Attachment
107
09/21/2015
OPINION AND ORDER granting 65 Motion in Limine; denying 67 Motion in Limine; granting 69 Motion in Limine; denying 71 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion in Limine; denying 75 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion in Limine; denying 78 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 79 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/2015.
108
09/21/2015
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 102 and 104 Responses to Motion. CORRECTION: The correct image file was added as the attachment to each docket entry, based on the attached correspondence. The linkage for docket entry 102 was corrected and the docket text modified as follows: "RESPONSE to Motion re 67 MOTION in Limine." The linkage for docket entry 104 was corrected and the docket text modified as follows: "RESPONSE to Motion re 69 MOTION in Limine."
109
12/18/2015
MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Records of Dr. Harshfield by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit Affidavit
1 Attachment
110
12/18/2015
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 109 Motion to Exclude Testimony and Records of Dr. Harshfield filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
111
12/24/2015
MOTION for Reconsideration re 92 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Alexandra Sims
112
12/29/2015
NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Subpoena Served for Trial
113
12/30/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 111 MOTION for Reconsideration re 92 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
114
12/30/2015
MOTION for Order to Require Deposition Designations by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
115
12/31/2015
ORDER granting 114 motion to require timely designation of depositions to be used as evidence. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/31/2015.
116
12/31/2015
Second MOTION for Reconsideration re 107 Order on Motion in Limine, Finding Plaintiff Failed to File a Response to Defendant's Third Motion in Limine by Alexandra Sims
117
12/31/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION in Limine Harshfield filed by Alexandra Sims.
118
01/04/2016
ORDER granting 116 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 69 motion in limine with respect to impairment rating. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/4/2016.
119
01/07/2016
REPLY to Response to Motion re 109 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Records of Dr. Harshfield filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit Email
1 Attachment
120
01/08/2016
ORDER denying 111 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/8/2016.
121
01/11/2016
ORDER directing counsel to be present at 8:30 AM Tuesday, January 19, 2016 for the jury trial set in this matter; an agreed set of jury instructions must be submitted to the Court by close of business, Wednesday, January 13, 2016; each party must also submit to the Court by that same date a concise statement of the case, no more than one page in length, that it proposes would be proper to read to the panel of venire persons during voir dire, and also any proposed voir dire questions it wishes the Court to pose to the panel. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/11/16. (tjb) (Docket text modified on 1/12/2016 to correct a typographical error).
122
01/13/2016
OPINION AND ORDER granting 109 State Farm's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/13/16. (tjb) (Docket text modified on 1/14/2016 to correct the description of the document filed.)
123
01/13/2016
ORDER Don P. Chaney, Jr., Nathan P. Chaney, and S. Taylor Chaney, counsel for plaintiff in this matter, are hereby authorized to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas, on January 19, 2016, through January 22, 2016, subject to the rules in this order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/13/16.
124
01/13/2016
MEMORANDUM Statement of the Case
01/14/2016
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 122 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "OPINION AND ORDER." (Text entry; no document attached.)
125
01/14/2016
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Leon Holmes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on Thursday, 1/14/2016 to address issue concerning witness testimony. Don Chaney present for plaintiff; John Moore, Ashleigh Phillips present for defendant. Counsel directed to confer with witness and one another and inform Court of how they intend to proceed. (Court Reporter Genie Power)
126
01/14/2016
OBJECTIONS by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
5 Attachments
127
01/14/2016
OBJECTIONS by Alexandra Sims
1
Exhibit Dr. Scott Harter's Deposition
2
Exhibit Dr. Fredric Shotts' Deposition
3
Exhibit Dr. Tanya Owen's Deposition
3 Attachments
128
01/15/2016
ORDER granting continuance. The trial of this matter previously scheduled for Tuesday, January 19, 2016, is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/15/2016.
129
01/21/2016
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Alexandra Sims
130
01/27/2016
ORDER granting 129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Nathan Chaney is withdrawn as counsel of record for this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/16.
131
03/25/2016
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for the week of 8/22/2016 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 8/2/2016. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw) (Docket text modified on 3/28/2016 to correct the Pretrial Disclosure Sheet deadline.)
03/28/2016
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 131 Amended Final Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the Pretrial Disclosure Sheet deadline to 8/2/2016, as stated in the Order. (Text entry; no document attached.)
132
04/13/2016
MOTION to Exclude (Renewed) to Exclude Testimony and Records of Dr. Harshfield by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit Correspondence
2
Exhibit Email correspondence
3
Exhibit Email correspondence
4
Exhibit Correspondence
5
Exhibit Email correspondence
6
Exhibit Correspondence
7
Exhibit Email correspondence
8
Exhibit Correspondence
9
Exhibit Email correspondence
10
Exhibit Correspondence
11
Exhibit Email correspondence
11 Attachments
133
04/13/2016
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 132 Motion to Exclude, (Renewed) Testimony and Records of Dr. Harshfield filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
134
04/25/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 132 MOTION to Exclude (Renewed) to Exclude Testimony and Records of Dr. Harshfield filed by Alexandra Sims.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
135
05/25/2016
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for the week of 1/9/2017 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock, Courtroom #4D before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 12/20/2016. Signed at the direction of the Court.
136
06/02/2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's 132 renewed Motion to Exclude the testimony and records of Dr. Harshfield. The motion is denied on the condition that Dr. Harshfield attend a deposition in Little Rock on or before 9/30/2016. If he fails to do so, the motion is granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/2/2016.
137
08/03/2016
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
138
08/29/2016
MOTION to Take Deposition from Dr David Harshfield via Webinar by Alexandra Sims
139
09/12/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 138 MOTION to Take Deposition from Dr David Harshfield via Webinar filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
140
09/15/2016
ORDER denying Alexandra Sims's 138 motion requesting that Dr. David L. Harshfield be allowed to sit for his deposition by webinar. Dr. Harshfield must sit for a deposition in Little Rock, Arkansas, on or before 9/30/2016. If he fails to do so, he will not be allowed to testify at trial, and Sims will not be allowed to introduce any of his reports, records, or opinions, nor will any witness be allowed to rely upon his reports, records, or opinions. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/15/2016.
141
10/31/2016
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Causation Opinion Testimony of Dr. David Harshfield by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit Depo - David Harshfield
1 Attachment
142
10/31/2016
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 141 Motion in Limine to Exclude Causation Opinion Testimony of Dr. David Harshfield filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
143
11/14/2016
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 141 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Causation Opinion Testimony of Dr. David Harshfield, 142 Brief in Support by Alexandra Sims
144
11/15/2016
ORDER granting Alexandra Sims' 143 motion requesting a four-day extension of time to respond to State Farm's 141 motion to exclude testimony of Dr. David Harshfield. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/15/2016.
145
11/18/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 141 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Causation Opinion Testimony of Dr. David Harshfield filed by Alexandra Sims.
146
12/19/2016
ORDER granting without objection the 141 motion to exclude any causation opinion testimony by Dr. David Harshfield. Dr. David Harshfield will not testify as to the cause of injuries and damages that he found in his MR studies of Alexandra Sims. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/19/2016.
147
12/20/2016
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
148
12/21/2016
MOTION for Order Motion to Renew its Previously Filed Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit Plf's 2nd Supp Depo Designation
1 Attachment
149
12/29/2016
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Subpoena for Trial-Dr. Nix by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
150
12/30/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 148 MOTION for Order Motion to Renew its Previously Filed Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations filed by All Plaintiffs.
151
01/03/2017
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process - Trial Subpoena-Dr. Joseph Shotts by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
152
01/03/2017
OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Deposition Designations by All Plaintiffs (Docket text modified on 1/4/2017 to correct the description of the document filed).
153
01/04/2017
ORDER: The Court has determined that the jury trial will begin at 9:15 AM on Monday, 1/9/2017, in Courtroom #4D, Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, in Little Rock, Arkansas. Counsel should be present by 8:30 AM, to take up pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/4/2017.
01/04/2017
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 152 MOTION for Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "OBJECTIONS to Defendant's Deposition Designations by All Plaintiffs" as marked on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
154
01/05/2017
ORDER: State Farm's objections to the use of Ripley and Rodriguez's depositions at trial are sustained. State Farm also objected to portions of the designations of the depositions of Leonard Anthony Notto, D.C., and Richard Riley, D.C. Those objections are overruled. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/5/2017.
155
01/06/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re 152 MOTION for Order Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
1
Exhibit Deposition of Dr. Shotts
2
Exhibit Deposition of Dr. Owen
2 Attachments
156
01/09/2017
ORDER authorizing Susanna Berna, corporate counsel for defendant in this matter, to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas, on 1/9/2017 through 1/12/2017. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/2017.
157
01/09/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Leon Holmes: JURY TRIAL (DAY 1) held on Monday, 1/9/2017. Donald Chaney, Taylor Chaney present for plaintiff; John Moore, Sarah Cullen, Ashleigh Phillips present for defendant. Voir dire by Court and counsel. Jury of 12 seated and sworn. Opening statements by counsel. Plaintiff's proof begins. (Court Reporter Genie Power)
158
01/10/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Leon Holmes: JURY TRIAL (DAY 2) held on Tuesday, 1/10/2017. Plaintiff's proof continues. (Court Reporter Genie Power)
159
01/11/2017
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Leon Holmes: JURY TRIAL (DAY 3) held on Wednesday, 1/11/2017. Plaintiff's proof concludes, plaintiff rests. Defendant's proof concludes, defendant rests. (Court Reporter Genie Power)
160
01/12/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Leon Holmes: JURY TRIAL (DAY 4) held on Thursday, 1/12/2017. Court reads jury instructions to jurors. Closing arguments by counsel. Jurors retire for deliberations at 10:49 AM Verdict published at 2:35 PM Jurors excused from further service. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Genie Power)
161
01/12/2017
WITNESS LIST by Alexandra Sims
162
01/12/2017
WITNESS LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
163
01/12/2017
EXHIBIT LIST by Alexandra Sims
164
01/12/2017
EXHIBIT LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
165
01/12/2017
JURY INSTRUCTIONS given by the Court
166
01/12/2017
PROFFERED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Alexandra Sims
167
01/12/2017
PROFFERED EXHIBIT LIST by Alexandra Sims
168
01/12/2017
JURY VERDICT
169
01/12/2017
RECEIPT for Exhibits by Alexandra Sims
170
01/12/2017
RECEIPT for Exhibits by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
171
01/12/2017
JUDGMENT is entered in favor of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on the claims of Alexandra Sims. The complaint of Alexandra Sims is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/12/2017.
172
01/17/2017
MOTION to Contact Jurors by Alexandra Sims. (Docket text modified on 1/18/2017 to correct the description of the document filed).
01/18/2017
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 172 Request. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "MOTION to Contact Jurors" as marked on the document. (Text entry; no document attached.)
173
01/18/2017
ORDER granting plaintiff's 172 motion to contact jurors. The jury clerk is directed to send a letter of inquiry to each of the jurors sitting on this case to determine if they wish to be contacted. The names and telephone numbers of those who have indicated they have no objection to being contacted will be provided to the attorneys for both parties as soon as the responses have been received. The attorneys may contact the jurors whose names and addresses are provided in this manner, but no others. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/2017.
174
01/23/2017
MOTION for Costs by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
3
Exhibit
3 Attachments
175
01/23/2017
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re 174 Motion for Costs filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
176
02/06/2017
RESPONSE to Motion re 174 MOTION for Costs filed by Alexandra Sims.
177
02/10/2017
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 92 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 107 Order on Motion in Limine, 171 Judgment, 120 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Alexandra Sims.
178
02/13/2017
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 177 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Sims re: 92 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 107 Order on Motion in Limine, 120 Order on Motion for Reconsideration and 171 Judgment. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPTS SHOULD BE FILED WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERK.
179
02/13/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re 174 MOTION for Costs Pursuant to Rule 54 and Rule 68 of FRCP filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.
180
02/13/2017
USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to 177 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Sims. USCA Case Number 17-1333. Transcript due by 3/27/2017.
181
02/15/2017
USCA Appeal Fees received $505.00 receipt number LIT060540 re 177 Notice of Appeal filed by Alexandra Sims.
182
02/21/2017
OPINION AND ORDER denying State Farm's 174 motion for costs. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/21/2017.
183
03/24/2017
Transcript of Trial - Volume 1 filed for date of January 9, 2017, before Judge J. Leon Holmes, re 177 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter Eugenie M. Power. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 3/31/2017. Redaction Request due 4/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2017.
184
03/24/2017
Transcript of Trial - Volume 2 filed for date of January 10, 2017, before Judge J. Leon Holmes, re 177 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter Eugenie M. Power. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 3/31/2017. Redaction Request due 4/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2017.
185
03/24/2017
Transcript of Trial - Volume 3 filed for date of January 11, 2017, before Judge J. Leon Holmes, re 177 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter Eugenie M. Power. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 3/31/2017. Redaction Request due 4/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2017.
186
03/24/2017
Transcript of Trial - Volume 4 filed for date of January 12, 2017, before Judge J. Leon Holmes, re 177 Notice of Appeal. Court Reporter Eugenie M. Power. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 3/31/2017. Redaction Request due 4/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2017.
187
03/27/2017
Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 177 Notice of Appeal: 4 Volume Transcript of Trial, January 9-12, 2017, docket entries 183, 184, 185 and 186.

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.