Singh v. Holder et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2013-cv-00166 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 435 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/24/2013
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Emergency Order to Show Cause (Fed/2241) Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number PHX 0970-7692956, filed by Sukhwinder Singh (submitted by Samin Adib).
1
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025110370297" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025110370297','753238','9','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Civil Cover Sheet)
1 Attachment
2
01/24/2013
SUMMONS Submitted by Sukhwinder Singh (submitted by Samin Adib).
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025110370307" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025110370307','753238','11','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
3
01/24/2013
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT:
4
01/25/2013
Summons Issued as to Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Katrina S Kane, Janet A Napolitano. *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
1
Summons
2
https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/doc1/025110370388" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/025110370388','753238','15','','2','1','',''}};">2</a> Summons)
2 Attachments
5
01/25/2013
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) filed by Sukhwinder Singh. Description of deficiency: Document not in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(c): Document should be in PDF format and text searchable.
01/25/2013
PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX130245 as to Naresh M Gehi. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
01/24/2013
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Naresh M Gehi on behalf of Sukhwinder Singh.
7
01/25/2013
ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
8
02/01/2013
* Summons Returned Executed as to USA; Summons Returned Executed Upon US Agency/Officer served on Holder, Napolitano, Kane on 1/31/13, filed by Sukhwinder Singh. * Modified to correct event on 2/4/2013
9
03/11/2013
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sukhwinder Singh.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
10
05/24/2013
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Granting the Motion to Substitute Counsel (Doc. 9). Kathy O'Quinn is substituted for Samin Adib as local counsel for Petitioner. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Summons, the Petition(Doc. 1), and this Order upon the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona by certified mail addressed to the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of Court must also send by certified mail a copy of the Summons, the Petition, and this Order to the United States Attorney General pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1)(B) and to Respondents pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/22/13.
11
05/24/2013
Summons Issued as to Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Katrina S Kane, Janet A Napolitano by service upon US Attorney, District of Arizona, ATTN: CV Process Clerk. (LAD). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
12
05/31/2013
SUMMONS Returned Executed Katrina S Kane served on 5/28/2013 by certified mail service upon the US Attorney, District of Arizona.
13
06/14/2013
RESPONSE re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241) Opposition by Respondents Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Katrina S Kane, Janet A Napolitano.
1
Supplement Exhibit Index
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Exhibit C
5
Exhibit D
6
Exhibit E
7
Exhibit F
8
Exhibit G
9
Exhibit H
10
Exhibit I
10 Attachments
14
06/14/2013
Additional Attachments to Main Document re 13 Response, by Respondents Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Katrina S Kane, Janet A Napolitano.
1
Exhibit J
2
Exhibit K
3
Exhibit L
3 Attachments
15
07/12/2013
* RESPONSE to opposition to habeas 13 by Petitioner Sukhwinder Singh. * Modified to add document linkage on 7/15/2013
16
08/08/2013
NOTICE re to Court and Suggestion of Mootness by Eric Himpton Holder, Jr, Katrina S Kane, Janet A Napolitano.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
17
08/12/2013
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that within ten (10) days from the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must file a response to this Order showing good cause why this action should not be dismissed as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/9/13.
18
08/28/2013
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed as moot and without prejudice. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 8/28/13.
19
12/02/2013
ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 18 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED AND ADOPTED by the Court. ORDERED that Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED as MOOT and without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/2/2013. (LFIG)
20
12/02/2013
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed December 2, 2013, judgment of dismissal is entered. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (LFIG)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.