Skagway JewelryCo LLC et al v. Westmark Hotels Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cv-00005 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
300
07/31/2018
~Util - Set Hearings
301
07/31/2018
Notice (Other)
302
08/02/2018
Notice (Other)
303
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
304
08/06/2018
New Trial
08/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/07/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
306
08/10/2018
Pretrial Order
08/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/10/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
308
09/10/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.