Smith, et al v. Phoenix Home Life
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1998-cv-01208 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 692 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/23/1998
DEMAND for jury trial by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock
2
11/03/1998
SUMMONS issued for Phoenix Home Life; summons and complaint mailed to said defendant cmrrr
11/03/1998
Sent Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge to Plaintiff's Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/03/1998
File referred to Magistrate Judge Walker (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/05/1998
RETURN RECEIPT CARD showing service of summons and complaint on J. Stanfield on 10/4/98 for Phoenix Home Life. Answer due on 10/24/98 for Phoenix Home Life
4
11/16/1998
MOTION by Phoenix Home Life to Extend Time until l2/l9/98 to answer or respond to complaint referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
11/17/1998
Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge mailed to counsel for the defendants (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/24/1998
Stamped ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time until l2/l9/98 to answer or respond to complaint (by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/01/1998
MOTION by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock for Injunction (Exhibits A-E attached), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
6
12/03/1998
Defendant's Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, referred to Magistrate Judge Walker
7
12/03/1998
Plaintiffs' Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge, referred to Magistrate Judge Walker
8
12/03/1998
RESPONSE by Phoenix Home Life in opposition to [5-1] motion for Injunction by plaintiffs (Exhibits maintained in seperate binder), referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Russ Walker (war) Modified on 12/03/1998
9
12/03/1998
ORDER, motion hearing set for 2:30 12/4/98 before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker for [5-1] motion for Injunction, 3rd Floor Courtroom; directing the Clerk to notify all counsel of record by facsimile (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to JT, TCC.
10
12/04/1998
BRIEF by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock in support of [5-1] motion for Injunction (w/attachment), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
12/04/1998
Motion hearing held re: [5-1] motion for Injunction by plaintiffs (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/04/1998
Courtroom Deputy's MINUTES of proceedings: Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction held before Magistrate Judge Susan Russ Walker on l2/4/98
12
12/04/1998
ORDER denying [5-1] motion for Injunction (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel.
13
12/09/1998
MOTION by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock to set scheduling conference referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
14
12/11/1998
ORDER, reset Scheduling Conference for 4:45 1/7/98 before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker ; directing counsel for the plaintiff to set up the conference call (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to JT, TCC.
15
12/16/1998
MOTION by Phoenix Home Life to Dismiss (Exhibits in support maintained in seperate binder), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
16
12/16/1998
MEMORANDUM by Phoenix Home Life in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by Phoenix Home Life referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
17
12/18/1998
ORDER, Plaintiffs' Response to Motion set to 1/8/99 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss, set reply brief deadline for 1/15/99 for Phoenix Home Life (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel.
18
01/08/1999
RESPONSE by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock to [15-1] motion to Dismiss by Phoenix Home Life (Exhibits A-E attached), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
19
01/08/1999
MOTION by Phoenix Home Life for Gregory M. Petrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 74888 referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
20
01/13/1999
NOTICE of FILING LETTER by Phoenix Home Life in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss (Letter Attached), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
21
01/14/1999
ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Gregory M. Petrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice FILING FEE $ 10.00 RECEIPT # 74888 (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel.
22
01/14/1999
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial hearing for l/l9/2000 at 4:30; Discovery Deadline for l/5/2000; Motion Filing deadline on 10/19/99 ; set amended pleading deadline for 3/30/99 Mediation Notice deadline on 4/25/99 (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to JT, HHC.
01/14/1999
Deadline updated; setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery cutoff to 1/5/00 ; Pretrial Conference for 4:30 1/19/00 before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker ; (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/15/1999
MOTION by Phoenix Home Life for (Oral Argument) Hearing referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
24
01/15/1999
REPLY (MEMORANDUM) BRIEF by Phoenix Home Life in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss by Phoenix Home Life (Exhibit l attached), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
25
01/15/1999
NOTICE of FILING Letter from John R. Schoonmaker by Phoenix Home Life in support of [15-1] motion to Dismiss (Letter attached), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
26
01/22/1999
MOTION by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Reply Memorandum referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
27
01/28/1999
ORDER denying [26-1] motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Reply Memorandum (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel.
28
02/04/1999
MOTION by Phoenix Home Life for Protective Order, and to Extend Time for Initial Disclosure (w/attachments), referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
29
02/26/1999
ORDER granting [28-1] motion for Protective Order, granting [28-2] motion to Extend Time for Initial Disclosure; extending the deadline for initial disclosures established in Section 2 of the Uniform Scheduling Order entered on l/l4/99 until l4 days after this court issues a ruling on the presently pending motion to dismiss; staying discovery for the same period of time (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel.
30
05/06/1999
NOTICE of FILING of ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock (w/attachment), referred to Magistrate Judge Walker
31
05/26/1999
RESPONSE by Phoenix Home Life in opposition to [30-1] notice of Filing of Additional Authority by plaintiffs referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
32
12/02/1999
ORDER setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 4:30 1/19/00 before Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker; Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/17/00 ; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to JT, YG, HC.
33
12/28/1999
JOINT MOTION by John D. Smith, Nat T. Harris, Michael G. Pettey, Niel R. Martinson, Emil A. "Buzzy" Budnitz Jr., Richard M. Flah, Johnny R. Adcock, Phoenix Home Life to convert Pre-Trial Hearing to Scheduling Conference, or, in the Alternative, to continue Pre-Trial Hearing referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker
34
01/03/2000
ORDER terminating [33-1] joint motion to convert Pre-Trial Hearing to Scheduling Conference, granting [33-2] joint motion to continue Pre-Trial Hearing; CONTINUING the pretrial hearing generally (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to JT, YG, HC.
35
04/24/2001
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Phoenix Home Life (w/attachments); referred to Mag. Judge Walker
36
05/18/2001
JOINT MOTION by Plaintiffs and Defendant for Dismissal without Prejudice ; (proposed order attached). Referred to Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker (dkt clerk)
37
05/24/2001
ORDER of DISMISSAL that upon joint motion of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED: Dismissing this case without prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs ; as to claims being asserted on behalf of a putative class, the Court finds that no steps have been taken to seek class certification, class certification has not occurred, no ntice has been given to any putative class, no prejudice to any class would follow from dismissal without prejudice and without notice, and no notice to absent putative class members is necessary or required under the premises; (signed by Mag. Judge Susan R. Walker). Copies provided to counsel. (dkt clerk)
05/24/2001
Case closed (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.