Smith v. Apple, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2016-cv-00693 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 693 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/28/2016
COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. filed by John Smith.
2
04/28/2016
Request for service by certified mail filed by John Smith. (SPT)
3
04/28/2016
NOTICE of filing Conflict Disclosure Statement by John Smith. (SPT)
05/03/2016
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601070982 (SPT) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/04/2016
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. by Clerk for service by certified mail. (SPT)
5
05/11/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed John Smith served on 5/6/2016, answer due 5/27/2016. (AHI)
6
05/23/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to Appear and Respond to the Complaint by Apple, Inc.
7
05/23/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to plaintiff's complaint by 6/27/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 5/23/16.
8
06/27/2016
Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) to Appear and Respond to the Complaint by Apple, Inc.
9
06/27/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to plaintiff's complaint by 7/11/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 6/27/16.
10
07/11/2016
MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) by Apple, Inc.
11
07/11/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED until 10/11/16 to allow the parties to finalize the settlement of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 7/11/16.
12
10/20/2016
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Apple, Inc.
1
https://ecf.alnd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01914286360" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01914286360','158717','32','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) Modified on 10/20/2016 (SPT)
1 Attachment
13
10/20/2016
DISMISSAL ORDER; Order that this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 10/20/16. (SPT)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.