Smith v. Autozone Stores LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

5:2016-cv-00745 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 631 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/06/2016
COMPLAINT against AZO-B LP and Autozone Stores LLC filed by John Smith.
2
05/06/2016
Request for service by certified mail for Autozone Stores LLC filed by John Smith. (AHI)
3
05/06/2016
Request for service by certified mail for AZO-B LP filed by John Smith.
05/09/2016
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601071194 (AHI) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/10/2016
Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to AZO-B LP and Autozone Stores LLC.
5
05/16/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Smith. Autozone Stores LLC served on 5/12/2016, answer due 6/2/2016. (SPT)
6
05/16/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Smith. AZO-B LP served on 5/13/2016, answer due 6/3/2016. (SPT)
7
06/01/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AZO-B LP, Autozone Stores LLC.
8
06/01/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their answer(s) to plaintiff's complaint by 6/17/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 6/1/16.
9
06/17/2016
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by AZO-B LP, Autozone Stores LLC.
10
06/17/2016
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AZO-B LP, Autozone Stores LLC. filed by AZO-B LP, Autozone Stores LLC
11
06/20/2016
ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 7/14/2016 at 10:30 AM Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 6/20/2016. (AHI)
12
06/20/2016
ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than August 1, 2016; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after August 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 6/20/2106.
13
07/22/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
14
08/02/2016
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by AZO-B LP, John Smith, and Autozone Stores LLC. (SPT)
15
08/02/2016
INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 08/02/16. (SPT)
16
08/09/2016
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/16/2016 and Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2017 as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 08/09/16.
1
https://ecf.alnd.uscourts.gov/doc1/01914229673" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/01914229673','158781','45','','2','1','',''}};">1</a> Pretrial Conference Instructions)(SPT)
1 Attachment
17
08/09/2016
QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 08/09/16.
18
09/06/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time by John Smith.
19
09/06/2016
TEXT ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time. The Rule 16 Scheduling Order dates for disclosure by plaintiff and defendants of experts and their reports are EXTENDED by 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Harwell G Davis, III on 9/6/16.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.