Smith v. Cox et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00216 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/21/2018
Complaint
2
09/21/2018
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
3
09/21/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
4
10/02/2018
Joinder
5
10/02/2018
Joinder
6
10/02/2018
Joinder
7
10/02/2018
Writ
8
10/02/2018
Declaration
9
10/03/2018
Declaration
10
10/10/2018
Declaration
11
10/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12
10/19/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
13
11/09/2018
Declaration
14
12/10/2018
Declaration
15
12/10/2018
Order
16
12/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
17
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
18
01/08/2019
Amended Complaint
20
01/23/2019
Order
21
01/30/2019
Temporary Restraining Order
22
01/30/2019
Declaration
23
02/05/2019
Order on Motion for TRO
24
02/11/2019
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
25
02/12/2019
Supplement
26
02/13/2019
Order Dismissing Case

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.