Smith v. National Retail Properties inc et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama

3:2016-cv-00520 (alnd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 635 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/30/2016
COMPLAINT against Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc, filed by John Smith.
2
03/30/2016
CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Smith.
3
03/30/2016
Request for service by certified mail for Gander Mountain Inc filed by John Smith.
4
03/30/2016
Request for service by certified mail for National Retail Properties Inc filed by John Smith.
04/01/2016
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601070075. (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
04/01/2016
Summons Issued as to Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc. Sent via certified mail.
6
04/06/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Smith. Gander Mountain Inc served on 4/4/2016, answer due 4/25/2016.
7
04/07/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Smith. National Retail Properties Inc served on 4/4/2016, answer due 4/25/2016.
8
04/19/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time by John Smith.
9
04/20/2016
TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS plaintiff John Smiths motion for a fourteen (14) day extension of time for the defendants to respond to the complaint. (Doc. 8). Defendants National Retail Properties, Inc. and Gander Mountain, Inc. shall file a response to Mr. Smiths complaint on or before May 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/20/2016.
10
05/09/2016
Defendants ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc.
11
05/16/2016
INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/16/2016.
12
05/20/2016
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Third Party Complaint to Join an Indispensable Party by Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc.
13
05/23/2016
TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a third party complaint. (Doc. 12). The defendants may file a third party complaint on or before June 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 5/23/2016.
14
05/27/2016
MOTION to Strike Defendants Affirmative Defenses by John Smith.
15
06/06/2016
TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff filed a motion to strike the defendants' first, sixth, seventh, eighth, and ninth affirmative defenses to the plaintiff's complaint and their demand for a jury trial. (Doc. 14). The Court SETS the motion for a telephone conference at 2:00 PM on June 21, 2016. Counsel of record shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/6/2016.
16
06/08/2016
First MOTION to Continue by Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc.
17
06/09/2016
TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the defendants' unopposed motion to continue the June 21, 2016 telephone conference. (Doc. 16). The Court RESETS the telephone conference for 3:00 PM on June 16, 2016. Counsel shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the call. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/9/2016.
18
06/09/2016
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Gander Mountain Inc.
1
Exhibit
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
19
06/10/2016
TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS attorney Thomas Coleman, Jr.'s motion to admit pro hac vice attorney Laura M. Jordan of the law firm Thompson Coburn LLP. (Doc. 18).Ms. Jordan will serve as additional counsel forthe defendant Gander Mountain, Inc. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/10/2016.
20
06/13/2016
Joint MOTION to Continue by Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc.
21
06/14/2016
TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to continue the telephone conference set for 3:00 PM on June 16, 2016. (Doc. 20). The Court RESETS the telephone conference for 2:00 PM on July 8, 2016. Counsel shall please dial 877-873-8018 and enter access code 5313999 to participate in the call. On or before June 28, 2016, the defendants may file a response in opposition to the plaintiff's motion to strike. On or before July 7, 2016, the plaintiff may file a reply. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/14/2016.
22
06/28/2016
RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION to Strike Defendants Affirmative Defenses filed by Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc.
23
07/08/2016
TEXT ORDER: Consistent with the discussion held on the record during a July 8, 2016 telephone conference in this action, the defendants shall file an amended answer on or before July 15, 2016. The Court asks the Clerk to please TERM as MOOT the plaintiff's motion to strike affirmative defenses. (Doc. 14). The Court also reminds the parties of their Rule 26 obligations. (See Doc. 11). On or before July 15, 2016, the parties shall please file a Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/8/2016.
24
07/15/2016
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Gander Mountain Inc, National Retail Properties Inc.
25
07/15/2016
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
26
08/03/2016
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/8/2017; Status Conference set for 5/10/2017 at 10:30 AM in chambers of the undersigned; Dispositive Motions due by 6/9/2017. This case shall be trial ready in November, 2017. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/3/2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.