Soleita Vei Chey
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00026 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/28/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
01/28/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
3
01/28/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
4
01/28/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
01/28/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/29/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
9
01/29/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
02/24/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/18/2019
Request for Special Notice
14
04/09/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
15
04/09/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
16
04/24/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
17
04/26/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
04/29/2019
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.