Sonja J. Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01736 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
40
08/27/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
41
08/27/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing
49
09/20/2018
Relief from Stay
09/20/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
09/20/2018
Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay
64
12/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
68
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
77
03/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.