Sonterra Capital Master Fund L v. UBS AG
Court Docket Sheet

2nd Circuit Court of Appeals

2017-00944 (ca2)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121422] [17-944] [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:03 PM]

Case 17-944, Document 157, 09/11/2017, 2121422, Page1 of 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR SUBSTITUTE, ADDITIONAL, OR AMICUS COUNSEL Short Title: Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. v. UBS AG _____ Docket No.: 17-944 ________ Substitute, Additional, or Amicus Counsel’s Contact Information is as follows: Name: Jonathan Ohring Firm: Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP Address: 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY 10005 Telephone: (212) 530-5147 ___________________________ Fax: 212-822-5147 E-mail: JOhring@milbank.com Appearance for: Coöperatieve Rabobank U.A. (f/k/a Coöperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.)/Defendant-Appellee (party/designation) Select One: G Substitute counsel (replacing lead counsel:) (name/firm) G Substitute counsel (replacing other counsel: _______) (name/firm) G Additional counsel (co-counsel with: David R. Gelfand/Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP ✔) (name/firm) G Amicus (in support of:) (party/designation) CERTIFICATION I certify that: ✔ G I am admitted to practice in this Court and, if required by Interim Local Rule 46.1(a)(2), have renewed my admission on OR G I applied for admission on. Signature of Counsel:/s/Jonathan Ohring Type or Print Name: Jonathan Ohring

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2124040] [17-944] [Entered: 09/13/2017 06:26 PM]

Case 17-944, Document 159, 09/13/2017, 2124040, Page1 of 1 September 13, 2017 Via ECF Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, Docket No. 17-944 Dear Ms. O’Hagan Wolfe: As directed by this Court’s June 13, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 151), Appellants California State Teachers’ Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. write to update the Court on the status of the district court proceedings consistent with the Indicative Ruling. JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, and J.P. Morgan Securities plc (collectively, "JPMorgan") recently advised that it would require until October 27, 2017, at the latest, to produce the names and addresses of its U.S.-based counterparties to Euroyen-based derivatives transactions for notice purposes. To accommodate this timing, Appellants, with consent from JPMorgan and Deutsche Bank AG and DB Group Services (UK) Ltd. (collectively, "Deutsche Bank"), filed a request with the district court on September 12, 2017 to adjourn the fairness hearing from November 9 to December 7, 2017, at which time the district court will consider final approval of the class action settlements. This request remains pending before the district court. We are available to answer any questions the Court may have concerning the status of the district court proceedings. Appellants will file another status update in 30 days. Respectfully submitted,/s/Vincent Briganti Vincent Briganti Counsel for Appellants cc: Counsel of Record (via ECF)

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 10/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2146770] [17-944] [Entered: 10/13/2017 10:53 AM]

Case 17-944, Document 160, 10/13/2017, 2146770, Page1 of 1 October 13, 2017 Via ECF Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, Docket No. 17-944 Dear Ms. O’Hagan Wolfe: As directed by this Court’s June 13, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 151), Appellants California State Teachers’ Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. write to update the Court on the status of the district court proceedings consistent with the Indicative Ruling. As advised in their prior letter to the Court, Appellants, with consent from JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, and J.P. Morgan Securities plc (collectively, "JPMorgan") and Deutsche Bank AG and DB Group Services (UK) Ltd. (collectively, "Deutsche Bank"), filed a request with the district court on September 12, 2017 to adjourn the fairness hearing from November 9 to December 7, 2017. The district court granted this request on September 14, 2017, issuing a superseding order preliminarily approving the proposed settlements with Deutsche Bank and JPMorgan and setting a December 7 fairness hearing to consider final approval of the settlements. See Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, case no. 15-cv-5844 (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. No. 355. We are available to answer any questions the Court may have concerning the status of the district court proceedings. Appellants will file another status update in 30 days. Respectfully submitted,/s/Vincent Briganti Vincent Briganti Counsel for Appellants cc: Counsel of Record (via ECF)

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 11/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171024] [17-944] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:29 PM]

Case 17-944, Document 161, 11/13/2017, 2171024, Page1 of 1 November 13, 2017 Via ECF Catherine O’Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, Docket No. 17-944 Dear Ms. O’Hagan Wolfe: As directed by this Court’s June 13, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 151), Appellants California State Teachers’ Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. write to update the Court on the status of the district court proceedings consistent with the Indicative Ruling. On October 31, 2017, Appellants filed their motions for final approval of the settlements with JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, and J.P. Morgan Securities plc (collectively, "JPMorgan") and Deutsche Bank AG and DB Group Services (UK) Ltd. (collectively, "Deutsche Bank"). See Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, case no. 15-cv-5844 (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. Nos. 368-79. As stated in Appellants’ prior letter to the Court, the fairness hearing is scheduled for December 7, 2017. Id., Dkt. No. 355. We are available to answer any questions the Court may have concerning the status of the district court proceedings. Appellants will file another status update in 30 days. Respectfully submitted,/s/Vincent Briganti Vincent Briganti Counsel for Appellants cc: Counsel of Record (via ECF)

MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to file a status update letter with the Court under seal and to waive the requirement of filing a redacted version on the docket [{{165}}] filed by Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., by DAL, FILED. [2199366][169] [17-944] [Entered: 12/21/2017 10:12 AM]

Case 17-944, Document 169, 168, 12/21/2017, 2199366, 2199339, Page1 of 1 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE SECOND CIRCUIT At a Stated Term of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, held at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City of New York, on the 21st day of December, two thousand and seventeen. Before: Debra Ann Livingston, Circuit Judge. ________________________________ Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman ORDER Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Docket No. 17-944 Plaintiffs - Appellants, v. UBS AG, et al., Defendants - Appellees, Citibank, N.A., et al., Defendants. ________________________________ Appellants move for leave to file a status update letter with the Court under seal and to waive the requirement of filing a redacted version on the docket. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. For the Court: Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk of Court

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 02/12/2018, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 02/12/2018 by CM/ECF.[2234036] [17-944] [Entered: 02/12/2018 04:39 PM]

Case 17-944, Document 176, 02/12/2018, 2234036, Page1 of 1 February 12, 2018 Via ECF Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, Docket No. 17-944 Dear Ms. O'Hagan Wolfe: As directed by this Court's June 13, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 151), Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. write to update the Court on the status of the district court proceedings. Appellants and Appellees The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd. ("BTMU") and Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation ("MUTB") executed a formal settlement agreement ("Settlement") on January 23, 2018. On February 6, 2018, Appellants moved the district court under Rule 60 to further amend its March 10, 2017 judgment, as amended June 19, 2017 ("Judgment") to exclude BTMU and MUTB for the purpose of considering approval of the Settlement. The district court granted Appellants' motion on February 7, 2018 and further amended the Judgment. See Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, case no. 15-cv-5844 (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. No. 396. On February 9, 2017, Appellants filed their motion for preliminary approval of the Settlement with the district court for hearing on March 8, 2018. See Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, case no. 15-cv-5844 (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. Nos. 397-99. We are available to answer any questions the Court may have concerning the status of the district court proceedings. Respectfully submitted, /s/ Vincent Briganti Vincent Briganti Counsel for Appellants cc: Counsel of Record (via ECF)

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 03/14/2018, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 03/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2256753] [17-944] [Entered: 03/14/2018 01:42 PM]

Case 17-944, Document 178, 03/14/2018, 2256753, Page1 of 1 March 14, 2018 Via ECF Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, Docket No. 17-944 Dear Ms. O'Hagan Wolfe: As directed by this Court's June 13, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 151), Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. write to update the Court on the status of the district court proceedings. The district court held a preliminary fairness hearing on March 8, 2018 to consider the proposed settlement ("Settlement") between Appellants and Appellees The Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd. ("BTMU") and Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation ("MUTB"). Following the hearing, the district court issued an order preliminarily approving the Settlement. See Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, case no. 15-cv-5844 (S.D.N.Y.), Dkt. No. 402. The district court will hold a fairness hearing on July 12, 2018 to consider final approval of the Settlement. We are available to answer any questions the Court may have concerning the status of the district court proceedings. Respectfully submitted, /s/ Vincent Briganti Vincent Briganti Counsel for Appellants cc: Counsel of Record (via ECF)

STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 04/16/2018, on behalf of Appellant Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and California State Teachers' Retirement System, alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 04/16/2018 by CM/ECF.[2279708] [17-944] [Entered: 04/16/2018 10:54 AM]

Case 17-944, Document 179, 04/16/2018, 2279708, Page1 of 1 April 16, 2018 Via ECF Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe Clerk of Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007 Re: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. v. UBS AG, Docket No. 17-944 Dear Ms. O'Hagan Wolfe: As directed by this Court's June 13, 2017 Order (Dkt. No. 151), Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. write to update the Court on the status of the district court proceedings. There have been no new developments concerning the proposed settlement ("Settlement") between Appellants and Appellees The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd. ("BTMU") and Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation ("MUTB"). The district court will hold a fairness hearing on July 12, 2018 to consider final approval of the Settlement. We are available to answer any questions the Court may have concerning the status of the district court proceedings. Respectfully submitted, /s/ Vincent Briganti Vincent Briganti Counsel for Appellants cc: Counsel of Record (via ECF)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/04/2017
NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. [2005143] [17-944] [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:26 PM]
2
04/04/2017
PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., district court receipt # 0208-13498764, FILED.[2005151] [17-944] [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:30 PM]
3
04/04/2017
DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/10/2017, RECEIVED.[2005155] [17-944] [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:32 PM]
4
04/04/2017
DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/10/2017, RECEIVED.[2005163] [17-944] [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:33 PM]
5
04/04/2017
ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2005168] [17-944] [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:34 PM]
13
04/06/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 04/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [2006288] [17-944] [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:43 PM]
14
04/07/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman, [13], in place of attorney Andrew Corydon Finch, SUBSTITUTED.[2006913] [17-944] [Entered: 04/07/2017 01:45 PM]
15
04/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation and The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2009627] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 10:24 AM]
16
04/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation and The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2009637] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 10:27 AM]
17
04/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation and The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2009643] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 10:29 AM]
18
04/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Cassady for Appellees Mitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation and The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-944, [17], ADDED.[2009662] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 10:40 AM]
19
04/12/2017
ATTORNEY, Daryl Libow for AppelleesMitsubishi UFJ Trust and Banking Corporation and The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 17-944, [16], ADDED.[2009694] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 10:53 AM]
20
04/12/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF.[2010430] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 04:46 PM]
21
04/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2010456] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 04:59 PM]
22
04/12/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., FILED. Service date 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF. [2010514] [17-944] [Entered: 04/12/2017 06:10 PM]
23
04/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Bank plc and HBOS plc, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2011119] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 02:35 PM]
24
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc, Lloyds Bank plc and Lloyds Banking Group PLC, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011145] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 02:57 PM]
25
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBOS plc, Lloyds Bank plc and Lloyds Banking Group PLC, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011153] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 03:00 PM]
26
04/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Mizuho Corporate Bank, Ltd. and Mizuho Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2011205] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 03:40 PM]
27
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Mizuho Corporate Bank, Ltd. and Mizuho Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011208] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 03:43 PM]
28
04/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2011302] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 04:41 PM]
29
04/13/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Tullett Prebon plc, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2011350] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:07 PM]
30
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Tullett Prebon plc, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011356] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:13 PM]
31
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Tullett Prebon plc, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011357] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:17 PM]
32
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011359] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:22 PM]
33
04/13/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2011363] [17-944] [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:42 PM]
35
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas Andrew Paskowitz for Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-944, [33], ADDED.[2011615] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:04 AM]
36
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan M. Unger for Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, in case 17-944, [32], ADDED.[2011617] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:07 AM]
37
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Gladstein for Appellee Tullett Prebon plc, in case 17-944, [31], ADDED.[2011620] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:10 AM]
38
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Brian T. Kohn for Appellee Tullett Prebon plc, in case 17-944, [30], ADDED.[2011624] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:12 AM]
39
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Jerome S. Fortinsky for Appellees Mizuho Bank, Ltd., Mizuho Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., Mizuho Corporate Bank, Ltd., in case 17-944, [27], ADDED.[2011630] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:16 AM]
40
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellees Lloyds Bank plc, HBOS plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-944, [25], ADDED.[2011637] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:21 AM]
41
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Appellees Lloyds Bank plc, HBOS plc, Lloyds Banking Group plc, in case 17-944, [24], ADDED.[2011648] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:24 AM]
42
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-944, [22], ADDED.[2011653] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:27 AM]
43
04/14/2017
ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., in case 17-944, [21], ADDED.[2011656] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:29 AM]
44
04/14/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, RBS Securities Japan Limited and RBS Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2012048] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 04:36 PM]
45
04/14/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, RBS Securities Japan Limited and RBS Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 04/14/2017 by CM/ECF. [2012088] [17-944] [Entered: 04/14/2017 04:57 PM]
46
04/17/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [44], on behalf of Appellees RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Japan Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED.[2012221] [17-944] [Entered: 04/17/2017 09:19 AM]
47
04/17/2017
ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for Appellees RBS Securities Inc., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, RBS Securities Japan Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, in case 17-944, [45], ADDED.[2012240] [17-944] [Entered: 04/17/2017 09:32 AM]
48
04/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Japan Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2012428] [17-944] [Entered: 04/17/2017 11:41 AM]
50
04/17/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Shinkin Central Bank, FILED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013091] [17-944] [Entered: 04/17/2017 05:36 PM]
51
04/17/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF, email.[2013098] [17-944] [Entered: 04/17/2017 06:10 PM]
52
04/17/2017
FORM D, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF, email.[2013099] [17-944] [Entered: 04/17/2017 06:12 PM]
53
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013421] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 11:45 AM]
54
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee DB Group Services (UK) Limited, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013444] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 12:03 PM]
55
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013477] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 12:27 PM]
56
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co. Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013485] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 12:30 PM]
57
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013512] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 12:42 PM]
58
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013526] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 12:48 PM]
59
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013653] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:24 PM]
60
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013703] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:50 PM]
61
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013710] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:54 PM]
62
04/18/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [51], on behalf of Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED.[2013713] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:56 PM]
63
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for Appellees J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-944, [61], ADDED.[2013733] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:09 PM]
64
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013739] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:12 PM]
65
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Thomas C. Rice for Appellees J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-944, [60], ADDED.[2013746] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:15 PM]
66
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Alexander Nuo Li for Appellees J.P. Morgan Securities PLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 17-944, [64], ADDED.[2013751] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:17 PM]
67
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Appellee Societe Generale, in case 17-944, [58], ADDED.[2013758] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:20 PM]
69
04/18/2017
FORM C, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013827] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:43 PM]
70
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013831] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:45 PM]
71
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013850] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:54 PM]
72
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013858] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:57 PM]
73
04/18/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [69], on behalf of Appellants California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED.[2013860] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:57 PM]
74
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013863] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:59 PM]
76
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr. for Appellants Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. and California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 17-944, [72], ADDED.[2013867] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:02 PM]
77
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Moses Silverman [54], in place of attorney Jeffrey J. Resetarits, SUBSTITUTED.[2013882] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:10 PM]
78
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Lee J. Lefkowitz for Appellants Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. and California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 17-944, [74], ADDED.[2013895] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:17 PM]
80
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Geoffrey M. Horn for Appellants Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd. and California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 17-944, [71], ADDED.[2013903] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:21 PM]
81
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee DB Group Services (UK) Limited and Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013921] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:31 PM]
82
04/18/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee DB Group Services (UK) Limited and Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013935] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:36 PM]
83
04/18/2017
ATTORNEY, Aidan Synnott for Appellees DB Group Services (UK) Limited and Deutsche Bank AG, in case 17-944, [82], ADDED.[2014002] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:03 PM]
84
04/18/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee SHOKO CHUKIN BANK, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014009] [17-944] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:05 PM]
86
04/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2014444] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:47 AM]
88
04/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Resona Bank, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014530] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 12:30 PM]
89
04/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Yokohama, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014848] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:33 PM]
90
04/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Bank of Yokohama, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2014860] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:36 PM]
93
04/19/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [86], on behalf of Appellees ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED.[2015039] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:41 PM]
94
04/19/2017
ATTORNEY, Michael Benjamin Weitman for Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Trust Bank, Limited, in case 17-944, [56], ADDED.[2015049] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:48 PM]
95
04/19/2017
FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2015075] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:06 PM]
96
04/19/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF.[2015129] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:02 PM]
97
04/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2015130] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:06 PM]
98
04/19/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., FILED. Service date 04/19/2017 by CM/ECF. [2015132] [17-944] [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:09 PM]
99
04/20/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 04/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2015264] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 09:26 AM]
100
04/20/2017
LETTER, dated 4/20/17, notifying the Court Societe Generale and Societe Generale S.A. on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale and Societe Generale S.A. are the same entity, RECEIVED. Service date 04/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2015344] [17-944]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by TT] [Entered: 04/20/2017 09:58 AM]
102
04/20/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale and Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 04/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2015681] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 01:25 PM]
104
04/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Shari A. Brandt [99], in place of attorney Brian S. Fraser, SUBSTITUTED.[2015726] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 01:55 PM]
105
04/20/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL [99], on behalf of Appellees ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED.[2015729] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 01:56 PM]
106
04/20/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 04/20/2017 by CM/ECF.[2015752] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 02:04 PM]
107
04/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-944, [98], ADDED.[2015864] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 03:05 PM]
108
04/20/2017
ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellees Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America N.A., in case 17-944, [97], ADDED.[2015867] [17-944] [Entered: 04/20/2017 03:08 PM]
110
04/26/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Resona Bank, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2020169] [17-944] [Entered: 04/26/2017 12:38 PM]
111
04/26/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [48], on behalf of Appellees RBS Securities Inc., RBS Securities Japan Limited, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED.[2020245] [17-944] [Entered: 04/26/2017 01:11 PM]
112
04/26/2017
ATTORNEY, Nicholas C. Adams for Appellee Resona Bank, Ltd., in case 17-944, [110], ADDED.[2020248] [17-944] [Entered: 04/26/2017 01:14 PM]
113
04/26/2017
NOTICE, to Appellees Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, UBS AG and UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2020257] [17-944] [Entered: 04/26/2017 01:21 PM]
114
04/26/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Resona Bank, Ltd., FILED. Service date 04/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2020277] [17-944] [Entered: 04/26/2017 01:38 PM]
115
04/26/2017
ATTORNEY, Catherine Fairley Spillman for Appellee Resona Bank, Ltd., in case 17-944, [114], ADDED.[2020282] [17-944] [Entered: 04/26/2017 01:43 PM]
116
04/27/2017
ATTORNEY, Catherine Fairley Spillman for Appellee Resona Bank, Ltd., in case 17-944, [114], ADDED.[2020897] [17-944] [Entered: 04/27/2017 09:02 AM]
117
05/01/2017
CORRECTED ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 05/01/2017 by CM/ECF.[2023830] [17-944]--[Edited 05/02/2017 by TT] [Entered: 05/01/2017 05:17 PM]
118
05/01/2017
CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 05/01/2017 by CM/ECF. [2023832] [17-944]--[Edited 05/02/2017 by TT] [Entered: 05/01/2017 05:20 PM]
119
05/01/2017
CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank plc and Lloyds Banking Group plc, FILED. Service date 05/01/2017 by CM/ECF. [2023835] [17-944]--[Edited 05/02/2017 by TT] [Entered: 05/01/2017 05:23 PM]
121
05/02/2017
CAPTION, please review current caption, AMENDED.[2024527] [17-944] [Entered: 05/02/2017 01:36 PM]
125
05/02/2017
NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2024736] [17-944] [Entered: 05/02/2017 03:18 PM]
126
05/02/2017
LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 06/06/2017, appellees' brief due date as 07/11/2017,TRANSMITTED.[2024766] [17-944] [Entered: 05/02/2017 03:25 PM]
127
05/03/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/03/2017 by CM/ECF.[2026243] [17-944] [Entered: 05/03/2017 04:33 PM]
128
05/03/2017
DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [127], on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, FILED.[2026304] [17-944] [Entered: 05/03/2017 04:50 PM]
129
05/04/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/04/2017 by CM/ECF.[2026385] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 08:21 AM]
130
05/04/2017
CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [128], [129], on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, FILED.[2026418] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 08:42 AM]
131
05/04/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 05/04/2017 by CM/ECF. [2027368] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 04:28 PM]
132
05/04/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 05/04/2017 by CM/ECF. [2027373] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 04:31 PM]
133
05/04/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 05/04/2017 by CM/ECF. [2027378] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 04:34 PM]
134
05/04/2017
ATTORNEY, Leigh Nathanson, Melissa Brooke Felder Zappala, Michael A. Brille for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays PLC, in case 17-944, [131], [132], [133], ADDED.[2027419] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 05:00 PM]
135
05/04/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, FILED. Service date 05/04/2017 by CM/ECF. [2027458] [17-944] [Entered: 05/04/2017 05:29 PM]
136
05/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Michael Lloyd Spafford for Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, in case 17-944, [135], ADDED.[2027568] [17-944] [Entered: 05/05/2017 09:01 AM]
137
05/17/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ICAP plc and ICAP Europe Limited, FILED. Service date 05/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2037085] [17-944] [Entered: 05/17/2017 09:51 AM]
138
05/17/2017
ATTORNEY, H. Rowan Gaither IV for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 17-944, [137], ADDED.[2037148] [17-944] [Entered: 05/17/2017 10:16 AM]
140
05/25/2017
MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2043900] [17-944] [Entered: 05/25/2017 05:45 PM]
142
06/02/2017
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., RECEIVED. Service date 06/02/2017 by CM/ECF.[2049048] [17-944] [Entered: 06/02/2017 10:08 AM]
143
06/02/2017
ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 06/02/2017 by CM/ECF.[2049963] [17-944] [Entered: 06/02/2017 07:37 PM]
144
06/02/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 06/02/2017 by CM/ECF. [2049966] [17-944] [Entered: 06/02/2017 07:44 PM]
145
06/02/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 06/02/2017 by CM/ECF. [2049967] [17-944] [Entered: 06/02/2017 07:46 PM]
146
06/05/2017
ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell, Peter Sullivan for UBS AG, in case 17-944, [144], [145], ADDED.[2050072] [17-944] [Entered: 06/05/2017 09:05 AM]
151
06/13/2017
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand and directing appellants to submit a status report every 30 days[140] filed by Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., by RSP, FILED. [2056556][151] [17-944] [Entered: 06/13/2017 10:10 AM]
152
06/13/2017
CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 06/13/2017, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[2056562] [17-944] [Entered: 06/13/2017 10:12 AM]
153
06/26/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 06/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [2066363] [17-944] [Entered: 06/26/2017 04:10 PM]
154
06/27/2017
ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for UBS AG, in case 17-944, [153], ADDED.[2066726] [17-944] [Entered: 06/27/2017 10:02 AM]
155
07/13/2017
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 07/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that parties are in the process of finalizing motions for preliminary approval of settlements to be filed with the district court by the end of this month, RECEIVED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2078638] [17-944] [Entered: 07/13/2017 06:21 PM]
156
08/14/2017
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 08/14/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that the district court will hold a fairness hearing on November 9, 2017 to consider final approval of the settlements, RECEIVED. Service date 08/14/2017 by CM/ECF.[2100487] [17-944] [Entered: 08/14/2017 05:03 PM]
157
09/11/2017
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 09/11/2017 by CM/ECF. [2121422] [17-944] [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:03 PM]
158
09/11/2017
ATTORNEY, Jonathan Ohring for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 17-944, [157], ADDED.[2121472] [17-944] [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:21 PM]
159
09/13/2017
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 09/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 09/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2124040] [17-944] [Entered: 09/13/2017 06:26 PM]
160
10/13/2017
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 10/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 10/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2146770] [17-944] [Entered: 10/13/2017 10:53 AM]
161
11/13/2017
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 11/13/2017, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 11/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2171024] [17-944] [Entered: 11/13/2017 05:29 PM]
169
12/21/2017
MOTION ORDER, granting motion for leave to file a status update letter with the Court under seal and to waive the requirement of filing a redacted version on the docket [165] filed by Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., by DAL, FILED. [2199366][169] [17-944] [Entered: 12/21/2017 10:12 AM]
01/18/2018
ATTORNEY, Mark A. Kirsch, [174], in place of attorney Peter Sullivan, SUBSTITUTED.[2215708] [17-944] (Text entry; no document attached.)
176
02/12/2018
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 02/12/2018, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 02/12/2018 by CM/ECF.[2234036] [17-944] [Entered: 02/12/2018 04:39 PM]
178
03/14/2018
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 03/14/2018, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P. and Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 03/14/2018 by CM/ECF.[2256753] [17-944] [Entered: 03/14/2018 01:42 PM]
179
04/16/2018
STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 04/16/2018, on behalf of Appellant Sonterra Capital Master Fund Ltd., Japan Macro Opportunities Master Fund, L.P., Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P. and California State Teachers' Retirement System, alerting court that <EDIT by Clerk's Office >, RECEIVED. Service date 04/16/2018 by CM/ECF.[2279708] [17-944] [Entered: 04/16/2018 10:54 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.