Sonya L Moore
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81784 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
4
06/15/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
6
06/16/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
06/18/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of) (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
06/22/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
47
02/22/2019
Convert Case
48
02/22/2019
Appointing Trustee
49
02/22/2019
Amended Schedules (Fee)
02/25/2019
Order: Approving Account and Discharging Trustee (Ch13-Conversion Non-Image) FOR COURT USE ONLY (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.