South Peninsula Hospital et al v. Xerox State Healthcare, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cv-00177 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
87
05/18/2018
Response in Support of Motion
05/21/2018
Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected (Text entry; no document attached.)
88
05/22/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
89
05/23/2018
Notice (Other)
90
06/20/2018
Scheduling Order
91
06/21/2018
~Util - Set Hearings
92
06/25/2018
Amended Complaint
93
07/10/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
94
07/17/2018
Compel
95
07/17/2018
Memorandum
96
07/30/2018
Notice (Other)
08/07/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
08/07/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
99
08/08/2018
Declaration
100
08/15/2018
Notice of Change of Address
101
08/21/2018
Response in Support of Motion
102
08/21/2018
Seal
103
08/24/2018
Hearing
104
08/24/2018
Notice (Other)
105
08/27/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
106
08/31/2018
Order on Motion to Seal
08/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
09/05/2018
Witness List
109
09/05/2018
Seal
110
09/05/2018
Witness List
112
09/13/2018
Statement
113
09/17/2018
Order
114
09/21/2018
Statement
115
09/27/2018
Order
116
10/04/2018
Order on Motion to Seal
117
10/05/2018
Errata
118
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Hearing
119
11/09/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
11/13/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
11/14/2018
Transcript
122
11/26/2018
Status Report
11/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
124
12/03/2018
Status Report
125
12/03/2018
Status Report
126
12/06/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.