Southcentral Foundation v. Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00018 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
142
08/29/2018
Leave to File Document
143
08/29/2018
Declaration
146
09/14/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
147
09/14/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
150
09/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
152
10/01/2018
Reconsideration
153
10/01/2018
Declaration
155
10/05/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
156
10/05/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
157
10/05/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
158
10/06/2018
Affidavit - Sealed pdf
159
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
160
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
161
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
162
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
163
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
164
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
165
10/06/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
166
10/15/2018
Stipulation
167
10/16/2018
Notice of Appeal
10/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
172
10/22/2018
USCA Case Number
173
10/22/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
10/24/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
174
10/22/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
178
11/16/2018
Document - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.