Southeast Alaska Conservation Council et al v. Stewart et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cv-00005 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
05/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
6
05/29/2018
Order
7
06/04/2018
Order
06/04/2018
Docket Annotation re Opening Brief (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
06/05/2018
Amended Complaint
9
06/05/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
10
06/07/2018
Affidavit of Service
11
06/14/2018
Reconsideration
12
06/18/2018
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
13
07/24/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
14
09/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
15
09/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
16
09/25/2018
Notice (Other)
10/01/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/31/2018
Summary Judgment
18
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)
19
11/15/2018
Order
20
11/15/2018
Summary Judgment
21
11/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
22
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.