Southeast Wood v. Osmose Wood, et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

2:1993-cv-00883 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 635 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/16/1993
COMPLAINT (dkt clerk)
2
07/16/1993
NOTICE to opposing counsel and circuit court of filing of notice of removal by Osmose Wood, Great Southern Wood (dkt clerk)
3
07/16/1993
DEMAND for jury trial by Osmose Wood, Great Southern Wood (dkt clerk)
07/19/1993
File referred to Judge Varner. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/1993
AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for defendant. (dkt clerk) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/20/1993
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Pretrial Conference for 1/12/94 ; Motion Filing deadline on 10/4/93 ; Discovery cutoff 12/29/93 ; jury trial set for 3/7/94 ; (signed by Judge Robert E. Varner), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and SL. (dkt clerk)
5
08/16/1993
ANSWER by Southeast Wood to [3-1] counter claim by Great Southern Wood, Osmose Wood; JURY DEMAND REQUESTED; referred to Judge Varner. (dmk) Modified on 08/17/1993
6
09/10/1993
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for Osmose Wood, Great Southern Wood by Walter R. Byars
7
09/13/1993
Parties' letter re: settlement negotiations.
8
09/30/1993
JOINT MOTION by Southeast Wood, Osmose Wood, Great Southern Wood to Extend Discovery Schedule ; referred to Judge Robert E. Varner
9
10/01/1993
ORDER amending 7/20/93 Rule 16 Order striking 75 days from paragraph 1 and substituting 12/13/93 as motion filing deadline; striking 75 days from paragraph 8 and substituting 12/13/93 as deadline for letter re: settlement ; striking 14 days from last paragraph on page 3 and substituting 10/12/93 as deadline to file objections to this order; that order otherwise shall remain in full force and effect, resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Motion Filing to 12/13/93 ; terminating [8-1] joint motion to Extend Discovery Schedule (signed by Judge Robert E. Varner), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, SL.
10
11/09/1993
MOTION by Osmose Wood, Great Southern Wood for Preliminary Injunction referred to Judge Robert E. Varner (dkt clerk)
11
11/09/1993
MEMORANDUM by Osmose Wood, Great Southern Wood in support of [10-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction by Great Southern Wood, Osmose Wood (copies of affidavits of Jimmy Rane and C. Frank Robertson attached as Appendix A and B; with separate exhibits; Exhibit B of the affidavit of Jimmy Rane in maintained in separate binder of case no. 93-V-907-N, doc. #18 [video cassette tape]); referred to Judge Robert E. Varner (dkt clerk)
12
11/10/1993
ORDER, motion hearing set for 10:00 12/15/93 for [10-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (signed by Judge Robert E. Varner), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT and SL. (dkt clerk)
13
12/02/1993
ORDER, resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference for 10:00 1/12/94, in chambers, before Judge Robert E. Varner ; that all pending motions will be heard 1/12/94 at 10:00 AM, in chambers; Proposed Pretrial Order due 1/5/94 ; that all attorneys who are to try case appear at hearing as further set out (signed by Judge Robert E. Varner), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, SL.
14
12/03/1993
ORDER, motion hearing reset for 9:00 12/15/93 for [10-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (signed by Judge Robert E. Varner), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, SL.
15
12/10/1993
Parties' letter re: settlement negotiations; referred to Judge Varner.
16
12/13/1993
MOTION by Southeast Wood for Summary Judgment referred to Judge Robert E. Varner
17
12/13/1993
MOTION by Southeast Wood for Partial Summary Judgment on claims for monetary damages ; referred to Judge Robert E. Varner
18
12/13/1993
BRIEF by Southeast Wood in opposition to [10-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction; referred to Judge Robert E. Varner
19
12/13/1993
MATTERS by Southeast Wood in opposition to [10-1] motion for Preliminary Injunction (Exhibits A-L attached); referred to Judge Robert E. Varner
20
12/13/1993
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS by Southeast Wood in support of [17-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment on claims for monetary damages by Wood, [16-1] motion for Summary Judgment and in opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Affidavits of Guice Slawson, Kenny Hall, Steve Eller and Don Honholt attached) by Southeast Wood; referred to Judge Varner
21
12/16/1993
Parties Settlement Stipulation; referred to Judge Varner.
22
12/20/1993
ORDER dismissing complaint and counterclaim without prejudice with each party to bear its own costs (signed by Judge Robert E. Varner), copies mailed to counsel; furnished to MT, SL.
12/20/1993
Case closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.