Spencer et al v. Ottosen Propeller & Accessories Inc., et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00188 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
115
05/17/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
116
05/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
117
05/24/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
118
06/11/2018
Witness List
119
06/20/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
120
06/26/2018
Reconsideration
121
07/27/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
122
08/03/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
123
08/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
124
08/20/2018
Leave to File Document
125
08/31/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
126
09/14/2018
Judgment
127
09/28/2018
Attorney Fees
128
09/28/2018
Declaration
129
09/28/2018
Bill of Costs
130
09/28/2018
Notice (Other)
131
10/08/2018
Notice of Appeal
132
10/09/2018
USCA Case Number
133
10/09/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
134
10/11/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
135
10/16/2018
Additional Related Document
136
10/16/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
137
10/18/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
138
10/25/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
139
10/25/2018
Additional Related Document
140
10/26/2018
Order
141
11/01/2018
Additional Related Document
142
11/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
143
11/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
11/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.