Stacy Ann Hallman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-bk-00303 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/29/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Stacy Ann Hallman
3
01/29/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
4
01/29/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
01/29/2016
*** Incorrect Notice as to Confirmation Date and Location *** Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/24/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/17/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 05/24/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/27/2016 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/25/2016. Modified on 2/1/2016 (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/29/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
6
01/29/2016
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
01/29/2016
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-00303-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18983981. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
01/29/2016
Debtor Request to Begin Electronic Noticing Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
8
01/30/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
02/01/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Stacy Ann Hallman Case Number 05-05853, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/17/2005; Case Number 07-05880, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/21/2007, Standard Discharge on 09/12/2011; Case Number 94-02104, Chapter 7 filed in California Southern Bankruptcy Court on 02/25/1994; Case Number 08-00095, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/09/2008, Standard Discharge on 06/14/2011; Case Number 02-34818, Chapter 7 filed in Illinois Northern Bankruptcy on 09/10/2002.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
02/01/2016
Amended Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/24/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 4/25/2016.Proofs of Claims due by 5/24/2016.Government Proof of Claim due by 7/27/2016.Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/22/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 2 (TOM) Birmingham.
10
02/03/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 02/03/2016.
11
02/03/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman). Notice Date 02/03/2016.
12
02/03/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/03/2016.
13
02/25/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 02/24/2016.
14
02/29/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments.
15
03/01/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments). Hearing scheduled 3/22/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
16
03/03/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 03/03/2016.
17
03/23/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/22/2016 11:06:49 AM ]. File Size [ 145 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:24 ]. (RE: Doc #14; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case (Insufficient notice time)). (adiuser).
18
03/24/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing.
19
04/06/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn. Signed on 4/6/2016 (RE: related document(s) 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments).
20
04/08/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 04/08/2016.
21
08/05/2016
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Salient Hospitalist.
22
10/14/2016
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Salient Hospitalist.
23
01/05/2017
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
24
02/27/2017
Adversary case 17-00033. 14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Stacy Ann Hallman against Sun Loan Company Alabama, Inc. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $350
25
06/05/2017
Motion to Approve Compromise Proposed Notice and Order submitted to OrdersTOM@alnb.uscourts.gov (related document(s) 24) Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman
06/06/2017
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-33 Closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
06/06/2017
Notice and Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise (Related Doc# 25) Signed on 6/6/2017.
27
06/08/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise). Notice Date 06/08/2017.
28
06/09/2017
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Individual, Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
29
06/12/2017
Application to Employ Davis & Norris, LLP as Attorney Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman
30
06/13/2017
Notice and Order Granting Application to Employ Bankruptcy Administrator, and Davis & Norris, LLP (Related Doc # 29) Signed on 6/13/2017.
31
06/15/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/15/2017.
32
11/24/2017
Withdrawal of Claims: 11 Filed by Creditor Speedy/Rapid Cash.
33
12/14/2017
Motion to Approve Compromise Filed by Special Counsel Davis & Norris, LLP, Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman
34
12/14/2017
Application for Compensation for Wesley Warrington Barnett, Special Counsel, Period: 7/22/2016 to 12/14/2017, Fee: $16,750, Expenses: $2,895. Filed by Attorney Wesley Warrington Barnett
36
12/15/2017
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 33 Motion to Approve Compromise filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman, Special Counsel Davis & Norris, LLP, 34 Application for Compensation filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman, Special Counsel Davis & Norris, LLP). Hearing scheduled 1/25/2018 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
37
12/17/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 36 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/17/2017.
38
01/08/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Individual Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
39
01/09/2018
Application to Employ Wesley W. Barnett, Davis & Norris, LLP as Special Counsel Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman
40
01/10/2018
Notice and Order Approving Application to Employ (Related Doc # 39) Signed on 1/10/2018.
41
01/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 40 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 01/12/2018.
42
01/18/2018
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck (RE: related document(s) 34 Application for Compensation for Wesley Warrington Barnett, Special Counsel, Period: 7/22/2016 to 12/14/2017, Fee: $16,750, Expenses: $2,895. Filed by Attorney Wesley Warrington Barnett filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman, Special Counsel Davis & Norris, LLP).
43
01/19/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 42 Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Jon A Dudeck). Hearing scheduled 1/25/2018 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
44
01/23/2018
Amended Application for Compensation for Wesley Warrington Barnett, Special Counsel, Period: 6/12/2017 to 1/23/2018, Fee: $16750, Expenses: $2895, for Davis & Norris, LLP, Special Counsel, Period: 6/12/2017 to 1/23/2018, Fee: $16750, Expenses: $2895. Filed by Attorney Wesley Warrington Barnett
45
01/23/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s)[44] Application for Compensation filed by Special Counsel Davis & Norris, LLP). Hearing scheduled 1/25/2018 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
46
01/23/2018
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for for Individual, Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities, Amended Schedule A/B: Property for Individual, Amended Schedule C Filed by Debtor Stacy Ann Hallman.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.