Stan Mike van dyk and Anita Louise van dyk
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-04811 (azb)

Trustee Notice to Abandon Property filed by DIANE M. MANN on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.

UST-3 PHX/PCT/FLG, 4-01 DIANE M. MANN P.O. BOX 12970 SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85267-2970 (480) 451-3053 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA In re:) CHAPTER 7) VAN DYK, STAN MIKE) Case No. 16-04811-PHX-MCW VAN DYK, ANITA LOUISE)) NOTICE OF TRUSTEE'S INTENT) TO ABANDON PROPERTY Debtor(s)) __________________________________________) NOTICE IS GIVEN that DIANE M. MANN, Trustee, proposes to abandon the following described property on the grounds that it is burdensome and of inconsequential value to the estate: 398 E Breckenridge Way, Gilbert AZ 85234-0000 Any person opposing the abandonment shall file a written objection and request for a hearing within 21 days of the date of mailing of this notice. The date can be obtained by a review of the court docket. The objection shall be filed with the United States Bankruptcy Court, UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT, 230 N 1ST AVE, STE 101, PHOENIX, AZ 85003. A copy of the objection shall be mailed forthwith to the Trustee and his attorney at the following address: TRUSTEE: DIANE M. MANN, P.O. BOX 12970, SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85267-2970 ATTORNEY FOR TRUSTEE: ADAM B. NACH, ESQ., LANE & NACH, P.C., 2001 E. CAMPBELL AVE, STE # 103, PHOENIX, AZ 85016 If a party in interest timely objects to the abandonment in writing and requests a hearing, the matter will be placed on the calendar to be heard by a United States Bankruptcy Judge. If there is no timely written objection and request for hearing filed, no hearing will be held and the property deemed abandoned without a court order having been entered. October 2, 2016/s/DIANE M. MANN DATE DIANE M. MANN, Trustee Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 27 Filed 10/02/16 Entered 10/02/16 09:05:54 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

Trustee Motion to Compel Debtors to Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.

1 Adam B. Nach – 013622 Jonathan C. Simon – 029750 2 LANE & NACH, P.C. 2001 E. Campbell Ave., Suite 103 3 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Telephone No.: (602) 258-6000 4 Facsimile No.: (602) 258-6003 Email: adam.nach@lane-nach.com 5 Email: jonathan.simon@lane-nach.com 6 Attorneys for Diane M. Mann, Trustee 7 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT 8 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 9 In re: (Chapter 7 Case) 10 STAN MIKE VAN DYK and ANITA No. 2:16-bk-04811-MCW LOUISE VAN DYK, 11 TRUSTEE’S MOTION TO COMPEL DEBTORS TO TURNOVER ESTATE 12 Debtors. PROPERTY 13 Diane M. Mann, Chapter 7 Trustee, by and through her attorneys undersigned, herein respectfully 14 submits her Motion to Compel Debtors to Turnover Estate property ("Motion"). For her Motion, Trustee 15 respectfully submits the following Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and the entire record of the 16 Chapter 7 administrative case. 17 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES 18 I. FACTUAL BACKGROUND. 19 1. This case was commenced by a voluntary Petition filed by Stan Mike Van Dyk and Anita 20 Louise Van Dyk ("Debtors") under Chapter 7 on April 30, 2016 ("Petition Date"). 21 2. Diane M. Mann is the duly appointed and acting trustee of the Chapter 7 Estate 22 (hereinafter "Trustee"). 23 3. Among the assets of this Estate are Debtors’ 2016 federal and state income tax returns 24 ("Tax Returns"). 25 4. Also among the assets of this Estate is the pro-rata share (33.06%) of Debtors’ 2016 26 federal and state income tax refunds. 27 5. Trustee has received Debtors’ 2016 federal income tax refund in the amount of $1,305.00. 28 Lane & Nach, P.C. 2001 E. Campbell Ave., Suite 103 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 56 Filed 08/10/17 Entered 08/10/17 11:29:25 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 3 1 6. Debtors have not turned over their 2016 state income tax refund ("Tax Refund"). 2 7. Despite demand, Debtors have failed to turnover the Tax Returns and Tax Refund to the 3 Trustee. 4 II. LEGAL AUTHORITY. 5 8. This Court has jurisdiction over the Debtors’ Chapter 7 case and the issues raised within 6 this Motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1334. Moreover, venue is appropriate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 7 1408(1) and 1409. 8 9. Property of the Estate includes "all legal or equitable interests of the debtor in property as 9 of the commencement of the case." See 11 U.S.C. § 541(a). The concept of property of the estate is 10 broad in scope, encompassing all kinds of property, including tangible and intangible property, causes of 11 action, real and personal property, certain property held by the debtor in trust for others, and certain 12 property of the debtor held by others. See U.S. v. Whiting Pools, 462 U.S. 198, n.9 (1983). 13 10. Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §521, the Debtors are required to "cooperate with the trustee as 14 necessary to enable the trustee to perform the trustee's duties" and to "surrender to the trustee, all the 15 property of the estate". Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §542, the Debtors have a duty to turn over the Tax Returns 16 and Tax Refund. 17 11. Debtors’ failure to turnover the Tax Returns and Tax Refund has caused harm to the 18 Estate in the form of unnecessary attorneys’ fees. 19 12. This Court has the authority pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §105 to issue any order "that is 20 necessary or appropriate to carry out the provisions of this title". The Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals has 21 recognized that the Bankruptcy Courts have the inherent power to sanction vexatious conduct presented 22 before the court. In re Rainbow Magazine, Inc., 77 F.3rd 278 (9th Cir. 1996). Moreover, the Ninth 23 Circuit BAP recently held that an award of attorneys’ fees may be warranted when a debtor fails to 24 comply with his or her statutory duties, including a debtor’s responsibility to cooperate with the Trustee. 25 In re Starky, 522 B.R. 220 (9th Cir. BAP 2014). Accordingly, Trustee requests that if Debtors fail to turn 26 over the Tax Returns and Tax Refund to the Trustee within fourteen (14) days of the Order directing 27 turnover, that Debtors shall be liable for the Trustee’s reasonable attorney’s fees and costs in the amount 28 of $750.00. Lane & Nach, P.C. 2 2001 E. Campbell Ave., Suite 103 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 56 Filed 08/10/17 Entered 08/10/17 11:29:25 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 3 1 2 WHEREFORE, Diane M. Mann, Trustee, respectfully requests for an Order of this Court: 3 A. Granting Trustee’s Motion; 4 B. Directing Debtors to turn over the 2016 federal and state income tax returns and 2016 state 5 income tax refund within fourteen (14) days of the Order Directing Turnover; 6 C. Directing that if the 2016 federal and state tax returns and 2016 state tax refund has not 7 been turned over to the Trustee within fourteen (14) days of the date of the Order Directing 8 Turnover, that Debtors shall be liable for the Trustee’s reasonable attorneys’ fees and costs 9 in the amount of $750.00; and 10 D. For such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper. 11 12 RESPECTFULLY SUBMITTED this 10th day of August, 2017. 13 LANE & NACH, P.C. 14 By:/s/Adam B. Nach-013622 Adam B. Nach 15 Jonathan C. Simon Attorneys for Trustee 16 17 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING 18 COPY of the foregoing delivered 19 via electronic mail to: 20 Jeffrey R. Finley Schneider Wallace Cottrell Conecky 21 8501 N. Scottsdale Road, Suite 270 Scottsdale, AZ 85253 22 Email: jfinley@schneiderwallace.com Attorney for Debtors 23 Office of U.S. Trustee 24 230 North First Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85003 25 Email: Renee.S.Shamblin@usdoj.gov 26 By:/s/Deborah McKernan 27 28 Lane & Nach, P.C. 3 2001 E. Campbell Ave., Suite 103 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 56 Filed 08/10/17 Entered 08/10/17 11:29:25 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 3

Notice of Filing Report of Judgment Balance filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) {{47}} Order on Motion for Wage Order).

1 Adam B. Nach - 013622 Jonathan C. Simon - 029750 2 LANE & NACH, P.C. 2001 E. Campbell Ave., Suite 103 3 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Telephone No.: (602) 258-6000 4 Facsimile No.: (602) 258-6003 Email: adam.nach@lane-nach.com 5 Email: jonathan.simon@lane-nach.com 6 Attorneys for Movant/Judgment Creditor 7 IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT 8 FOR THE DISTRICT OF ARIZONA 9 (Chapter 7 Case) 10 In re: 11 STAN MIKE VAN DYK and ANITA LOUISE No. 2:16-bk-04811-MCW VAN DYK, 12 13 Debtors. REPORT OF JUDGMENT BALANCE 14 15 DIANE M. MANN, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE, 16 Movant/Judgment Creditor, 17 vs. 18 STAN MIKE VAN DYK and ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, 19 Debtors/Judgment Debtors, 20 MARICOPA COUNTY, 21 22 Garnishee. 23 24 Instructions: Judgment Creditor is required to complete this report and send it to the Judgment Debtor and Garnishee within 21 days after the end of each quarter and when the balance due is less than 25 double the amount of nonexempt earnings received in the last two pay periods. Creditor shall also issue a report within 21 days after the balance is reduced to $500 or less, and, after that, before the 10th 26 of each month as long as the Order Continuing Lien is in effect. 27 1. This report covers the period from April 2, 2018 through May 15, 2018. 28 2. I received these payments during this period: Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 71 Filed 05/16/18 Entered 05/16/18 15:55:13 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 3 1 2 3 Check Date Amount 4 04.02.2018 $235.57 5 04.18.2018 $235.57 6 04.30.2018 $235.57 05.15.2018 7 (Debtors' Portion of 2017 Tax Returns) $872.39 8 TOTAL $1,579.10 9 3. Judgment balance at beginning of period $1,969.74 10 4. Total credited to the judgment balance this period $1,579.10 11 5. Interest accrued this period $0.00 12 6. Total outstanding balance on the judgment $390.64 13 14 7. The following statements apply if checked: 15 Balance due is $500 or less. Balance due is less than double the amount received in the last two pay periods. 16 Garnishee should stop withholding earnings. 17 RESPECTFULLY SUBMITTED this day 16th of May, 2018. 18 LANE & NACH, P.C. 19 20 By: /s/ Adam B. Nach - 013622 21 Adam B. Nach Jonathan C. Simon 22 Attorneys for Movant/Judgment Creditor 23 24 25 26 27 28 2 Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 71 Filed 05/16/18 Entered 05/16/18 15:55:13 Desc Main Document Page 2 of 3 1 COPY of the foregoing delivered via first class mail to: 2 Anita Louise Van Dyk 3 2340 E. University Drive, Lot 188 Tempe, Arizona 85281 4 Debtor 5 COPY of the foregoing delivered via electronic notification to: 6 Maricopa County Payroll 7 Human Resources Dept. Attn: Linda Greinke 8 301 E. Jefferson Street, Suite 220 Phoenix, AZ 85003-2145 9 Email: greinkel@mail.maricopa.gov Garnishee 10 By: /s/ Debbie McKernan 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 26 27 28 3 Case 2:16-bk-04811-MCW Doc 71 Filed 05/16/18 Entered 05/16/18 15:55:13 Desc Main Document Page 3 of 3

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 399 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
04/30/2016
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals, Schedules and Statements (except for those listed below). Failure to timely upload the list of creditors, may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Electronic Filing Declaration due 05/23/2016, filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of STAN MIKE VAN DYK, ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK
2
04/30/2016
Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK.
3
04/30/2016
Meeting of Creditors scheduled for 06/06/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Trustee Meeting Room, 230 N. First Avenue, Suite 102, Phoenix, AZ (341-PHX). Complaints objecting to discharge due by 08/05/2016. (Admin,)
05/02/2016
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for joint debtors STAN MIKE VAN DYK and ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK Case Number 14-04288, Chapter 13 filed in Arizona Bankruptcy Court on 03/27/2014, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/02/2015.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
05/02/2016
Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint--Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7))
5
05/02/2016
Notice of Financial Management Course Due
6
05/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) 4 BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint)
7
05/02/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 5 Notice of Financial Management Course Due)
05/06/2016
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-04811) [other,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26906863. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
05/20/2016
Notice of Appearance filed by S. MATT COLLINS of Fidelity National Law Group on behalf of S. Matt Collins Fidelity National Law Group.(COLLINS, S.)
9
05/22/2016
Financial Management Course Certificate filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of STAN MIKE VAN DYK.
10
05/22/2016
Financial Management Course Certificate filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK.
11
06/01/2016
Deficiency Notice to Attorney RE: Non-Compliance With Local Rule 1007-1(c) for No Declaration of Electronic Filing.
12
06/01/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 11 Deficiency/Warning Notice to Attorney for No Declaration of Electronic Filing)
13
06/05/2016
Limited Notice of Appearance filed by KIRK 4 GUINN of GUINN SEN & WALTON PLLC on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK.(GUINN, KIRK 4)
14
06/06/2016
Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
15
06/07/2016
Trustee Application to Employ Attorney / Declaration of Attorney filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
16
06/07/2016
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Authorizing Case Trustee to Employ Attorney filed by ADAM 1 NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 15 Application to Employ).
17
06/08/2016
ORDER Granting Application to Employ (Related Doc # 15) signed on 6/8/2016.
18
08/15/2016
Chapter 7 Discharge.
19
08/16/2016
Trustee Application for FRBP 2004 Examination and Production of Documents filed by JONATHAN CHARLES SIMON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
20
08/16/2016
Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Application for Production of Documents and Oral Examination filed by JONATHAN CHARLES SIMON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 19 Application for FRBP 2004 Examination).
21
08/17/2016
ORDER Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 19) signed on 8/17/2016.
22
08/15/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - Discharge of Debtor (related document(s) 18 BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge)
23
08/23/2016
Notice of 2004 Examination Notice Of Examination Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 And Certificate Of Service filed by JONATHAN CHARLES SIMON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
24
09/19/2016
The Trustee reports that he or she now holds funds of this bankruptcy estate or expects to receive funds which should result in a dividend to creditors who were previously instructed not to file claims. The Trustee hereby requests that the Court fix the last date for filing proofs of claim and that notice be given to creditors.
25
09/20/2016
Notice of Claims Bar Date. Proof of Claims due by 12/21/2016
26
09/20/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Claims Bar Date (related document(s) 25 BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date)
27
10/02/2016
Trustee Notice to Abandon Property filed by DIANE M. MANN on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
28
10/03/2016
Trustee Notice of 2004 Examination // Continued 2004 Examination and Certificate of Service filed by JONATHAN CHARLES SIMON of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
29
10/03/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 27 Trustee Notice to Abandon Property)
30
12/28/2016
Motion to Compel Trustees Motion To Compel Debtors To Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
31
12/28/2016
Notice of Bar Date Trustees Motion To Compel Debtors To Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 30 Motion to Compel).
32
01/25/2017
Certificate of Service and No Objections Re Trustees Motion To Compel Debtors To Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN. (related document(s) 30 Motion to Compel)
33
01/25/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Re Trustees Motion To Compel Debtors To Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 30 Motion to Compel).
34
01/26/2017
ORDER Granting Motion to Compel (Related Doc # 30) signed on 1/26/2017.
35
01/27/2017
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order (related document(s) 34 Order on Motion to Compel)
36
02/13/2017
Application for Writ of Garnishment and Summons filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
37
02/13/2017
Writ Issued via runner (related document(s) 36 Application for Writ)
38
02/14/2017
Certificate of Service on Garnishee filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN. (related document(s) 37 Writ Issued)
39
02/15/2017
Certificate of Service on Judgment Debtor filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN. (related document(s) 37 Writ Issued)
40
02/17/2017
Amended Application for Writ of Garnishment and Summons filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
41
02/17/2017
Writ Issued (over the counter via runner) (related document(s) 40 Application for Writ)
42
02/17/2017
Certificate of Service on Garnishee filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN. (related document(s) 41 Writ Issued)
43
02/21/2017
Certificate of Service on Judgment Debtor filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN. (related document(s) 41 Writ Issued)
44
02/23/2017
Answer of Garnishee filed by Maricopa County Payroll (related document(s) 42 Certificate of Service).
45
03/08/2017
Motion for Wage Order Application for Turnover of Nonexempt Earnings and Continuing Lien filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 44 Answer).
46
03/08/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order for Turnover of Nonexempt Earnings and Continuing Lien filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 45 Motion for Wage Order).
47
03/08/2017
ORDER for Turnover of Nonexempt Earnings of Judgment Debtor and continuing Lien on Earnings of Judgment Debtor (Related Doc # 45) signed on 3/8/2017.
48
03/09/2017
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order (related document(s) 47 Order on Motion for Wage Order)
49
03/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (related document(s) 48 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
50
03/09/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document (related document(s) 48 Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order)
51
04/04/2017
Notice of Filing First Quarterly Report of Judgment Balance filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
52
07/06/2017
Notice of Filing Second Quarter 2017 Report of Judgment Balance filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
53
07/21/2017
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Certificate of Service filed by KIRK 4 GUINN of GUINN SEN & WALTON PLLC on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK. (Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
54
07/21/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KIRK 4 GUINN of GUINN SEN & WALTON PLLC on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK (related document(s) 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney).(Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
55
07/24/2017
ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Related Doc # 53) signed on 7/24/2017. (Radicke-Stevenson, Michelle)
56
08/10/2017
Trustee Motion to Compel Debtors to Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
57
08/10/2017
Notice of Bar Date Re: Trustee's Motion to Compel Debtors to Turnover Estate Property filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 56 Motion to Compel).
58
08/17/2017
Response to Motion/Application To Compel (related to motions(s)56) filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
59
08/17/2017
Motion to Quash Garnishment filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK.
1
Exhibit A #
2
Exhibit B #
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
60
08/17/2017
Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Motion for Expedited Hearing filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK (related document(s) 59 Motion to Quash).
61
08/17/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK (related document(s) 60 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
62
08/18/2017
Amended Motion to Accelerate/Expedite Hearing filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK (related document(s) 59 Motion to Quash).
63
08/18/2017
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by JEFFREY R. FINLEY of SCHNEIDER WALLACE COTTRELL CONECKY on behalf of ANITA LOUISE VAN DYK, STAN MIKE VAN DYK (related document(s) 62 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite).
64
08/21/2017
ORDER Setting Expedited Hearing signed on 8/21/2017 (related document(s) 62 Motion to Accelerate/Expedite) Hearing set for 8/23/2017 at 01:15 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 7th Floor, Courtroom 702, Phoenix, AZ (MCW) Reply due by 8/23/2017.
65
08/22/2017
Response to Motion/Application Response to Debtors' Motion to Quash Garnishment (related to motions(s)59) filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN.
66
08/23/2017
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 08/23/2017 01:15 PM ]. File Size [ 7,406 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:15:48 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1381351)).
67
08/23/2017
ORDER, Minute Entry, signed on 8/23/2017 (related document(s) 59 Motion to Quash).
68
10/03/2017
Notice of Filing Third Quarter Report of Judgment Balance filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 47 Order on Motion for Wage Order).
69
01/03/2018
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report of Judgment Balance (4th Quarter 2017) filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 47 Order on Motion for Wage Order).
70
04/05/2018
Notice of Filing Quarterly Report of Judgment Balance filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 47 Order on Motion for Wage Order).
71
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Report of Judgment Balance filed by ADAM B. NACH of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DIANE M. MANN (related document(s) 47 Order on Motion for Wage Order).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.