Stanley Glen King
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00404 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/21/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
11/21/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
11/21/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/21/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
11/21/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
6
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
7
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
8
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
9
11/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10
11/26/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
11
11/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
12/07/2018
OSC Referral (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
12/07/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
13
12/13/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
14
12/13/2018
Comply (SA)
12/14/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.