Starkey v. Conant
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00248 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
42
06/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
43
06/04/2018
Dismiss
44
06/04/2018
Memorandum
45
06/26/2018
Answer to Amended Complaint
46
06/26/2018
Dismiss
47
06/26/2018
Memorandum
48
06/26/2018
Dismiss
49
06/26/2018
Memorandum
50
07/11/2018
Notice (Other)
51
07/12/2018
Dismiss
52
07/12/2018
Memorandum
53
07/13/2018
Errata
54
07/16/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
55
07/18/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
56
08/13/2018
Leave to File Document
57
08/13/2018
Amended Answer to Complaint
08/21/2018
Order of Recusal (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
09/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
62
10/02/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
63
10/05/2018
Notice (Other)
64
10/09/2018
Errata
10/10/2018
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
65
10/10/2018
Amended Answer to Complaint
66
10/10/2018
Third Party Complaint
67
10/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
68
10/24/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
69
10/24/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
70
10/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Answer
71
11/01/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
72
11/14/2018
Order
73
11/14/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
74
11/14/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
75
11/14/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
76
11/20/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.