State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00193 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/24/2018
Complaint
2
08/24/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
08/24/2018
Summons Returned Executed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/24/2018
Unissued Summons
4
09/11/2018
Order
5
09/18/2018
Affidavit of Service
6
09/18/2018
Affidavit of Service
11/01/2018
Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/01/2018
Status Report
11/05/2018
Order Staying Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
12/12/2018
Status Report
12/19/2018
Status Report Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
01/11/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.