State of Alabama et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Alabama

1:2016-cv-00593 (alsd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 163 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/29/2016
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt number 46031041426, Fee Paid at Intake), filed by State of Alaska, Bill Schuette, State Of Alabama, State of West Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Wyoming, State of Arkansas, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, State of Wisconsin, State of North Dakota, State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Texas, State of Nevada.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Civil Cover Sheet
3 Attachments
2
11/29/2016
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, Bill Schuette, State Of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming
3
12/01/2016
Summons Issued as to Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.
4
12/01/2016
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial.
1
request for reassignment) (srr
1 Attachment
5
12/01/2016
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade and Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-N after the case number on all future pleadings.
6
12/09/2016
MOTION for Bradley E. Meyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1993851, Online Credit Card Payment.) by State of Alaska.
1
Application for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice
2
Certificate of Good Standing
3
Certificate of Service
3 Attachments
12/09/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 6 MOTION for Bradley E. Meyen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1993851, Online Credit Card Payment.) with application and certificate of good standing attached; Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/09/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/9/2016.
8
12/15/2016
MOTION for Laura L. Chartrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-1997490, Online Credit Card Payment.) by State of Colorado.
1
Application
2
Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
9
12/15/2016
ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/15/2016.
10
12/20/2016
MOTION for Nicholas J. Bronni to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2000137, Online Credit Card Payment.) by State of Arkansas.
1
Cert of Good Standing
2
Cert of Good Standing
2 Attachments
11
12/21/2016
Amended MOTION for Nicholas J. Bronni to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State of Arkansas.
1
Cert of Good Standing
2
Cert of Good Standing
2 Attachments
12/21/2016
MOTIONS REFERRED: 10 MOTION for Nicholas J. Bronni to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 11 Amended MOTION for Nicholas J. Bronni to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
12/22/2016
ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/22/2016.
13
12/30/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Alaska, Bill Schuette, State Of Alabama, State of West Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Wyoming, State of Arkansas, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, State of Wisconsin, State of North Dakota, State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Texas, State of Nevada. All Defendants.
14
01/09/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Byrnes Floom on behalf of Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service
15
01/09/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Devon Lea Damiano on behalf of Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service
16
01/10/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by David Austin Robert Nimocks on behalf of State of Texas (Nimocks, David Austin)
17
01/12/2017
MOTION for Erik E. Petersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2009886, Online Credit Card Payment.) by State of Wyoming.
1
Application
2
Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
18
01/13/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Landon Maze on behalf of State Of Alabama
19
01/13/2017
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support by Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service.
20
01/13/2017
STIPULATION re 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support Stipulated Briefing Schedule by National Marine Fisheries Service, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell, Penny Pritzker.
01/13/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 17 MOTION for Erik E. Petersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/13/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 19 MOTION to Dismiss & MEMORANDUM in Support referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/13/2017
REFERRAL OF 20 Stipulated Briefing Scheduling re: Motion to Dismiss to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
01/13/2017
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/13/2017. (Attachment: # 1 Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge)
22
01/17/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Butler on behalf of Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service
23
01/17/2017
Notice of Filing Corrected Cert of Good Standing by State of Wyoming. Modified on 1/18/2017
01/18/2017
REFERRAL OF 23 Notice of Filing Corrected Cert of Good Standing to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
01/18/2017
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/18/2017.
25
01/18/2017
Order re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss & 20 Stipulated Briefing Schedule. Plf's response due by 2/24/2017. Dfts' reply due by 3/17/2017. Motion & related documents to be taken under submission on 3/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/18/2017.
26
01/19/2017
MOTION for Brett J. Talley to Withdraw as Attorney by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, Bill Schuette, State Of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming.
01/19/2017
REFERRAL OF 26 MOTION for Brett J. Talley to Withdraw as Attorney to Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
01/20/2017
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brett Talley terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/20/2017.
28
01/25/2017
Joint MOTION To Be Excused From Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Meeting and Report re 21 Preliminary Scheduling Order by Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
01/25/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 28 Joint MOTION To Be Excused From Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Meeting and Report referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/02/2017
NOTICE by New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, Bill Schuette, State Of Alabama, State of Alaska, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Nevada, State of North Dakota, State of South Carolina, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming of Amended Complaint
1
Amended Complaint
1 Attachment
30
02/02/2017
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State of Alaska, Bill Schuette, State Of Alabama, State of West Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Kansas, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of South Carolina, State of Wyoming, State of Arkansas, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, State of Wisconsin, State of North Dakota, State of Arizona, State of Louisiana, State of Texas, State of Nevada.
02/02/2017
Answer to 30 Amended Complaint due from National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Sally Jewell. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
02/09/2017
Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
32
02/10/2017
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 31 UNOPPOSED Motion to Stay Proceedings for a period of sixty (60) days. Defendants' response to amended complaint shall be filed twenty-one (21) days following the expiration of the stay. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/10/2017.
33
02/10/2017
MOTION for Frederick R. Yarger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2022310, Online Credit Card Payment.) by State of Colorado.
1
Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
2
Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
2 Attachments
02/10/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 33 MOTION for Frederick R. Yarger to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2022310, Online Credit Card Payment.), with application and Certificate of Good Standing attached; Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
02/10/2017
ENDORSED ORDER granting 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 2/10/2017.
35
02/13/2017
NOTICE by State Of Alabama of Substitution of Public Officer
02/13/2017
REFERRAL OF 35 Notice of Substitution of Public Officer to Judge Nelson. (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
02/15/2017
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Notice (Other) 35 filed by State Of Alabama
37
02/28/2017
MOTION to Intervene by Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife, Coastal Conservation League.
1
Disclosure Statement
2
Memorandum in Support
2 Attachments
03/01/2017
REFERRAL OF 37 MOTION to Intervene & Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene to Judge Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
03/02/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Intervenor Defendants Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., Coastal Conservation League, Defenders of Wildlife.
39
03/03/2017
Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement 38 filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife
40
03/03/2017
Order re: 37 MOTION to Intervene filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife. Any response in Opposition shall be filed no later than 4/25/2017 and any reply to the response shall be due no later than 5/2/2017. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/3/2017.
41
03/06/2017
Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Corporate Disclosure Statement 38 filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife
42
03/10/2017
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-MU after the case number on all future pleadings.
43
04/04/2017
Unopposed MOTION to Stay by All Defendants.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
44
04/05/2017
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 43 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. This action is STAYED for an additional sixty (60) days, through June 12, 2017. Defendants' response to amended complaint shall be filed no later than July 3, 2017. Any response in opposition to 37 MOTION to Intervene filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., and Defenders of Wildlife shall be filed no later than July 3, 2017, and any reply to the response shall be due no later than July 10, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 4/5/2017.
45
06/06/2017
Second Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings, by National Marine Fisheries Service, United States Fish and Wildlife Service.
1
Text of Proposed Order) Modified on 6/6/2017 (mab
1 Attachment
06/06/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 45 Second Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
06/09/2017
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 45 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. This action is STAYED for an additional ninety (90) days, through September 11, 2017. Defendants' response to amended complaint shall be filed no later than October 2, 2017. Any response in opposition to 37 MOTION to Intervene filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., and Defenders of Wildlife shall be filed no later than October 2, 2017, and any reply to the response shall be due no later than October 9, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/9/2017.
47
08/17/2017
ORDER on 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., Defenders of Wildlife. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/17/2017.
48
09/08/2017
Unopposed MOTION to Stay by All Defendants.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
09/11/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 48 Defendants' Third Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay of Proceedings; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
09/12/2017
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 48 Defendants' Third Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. This action is STAYED for an additional sixty (60) days, through November 10, 2017. Defendants' response to amended complaint shall be filed no later than December 1, 2017. Any response in opposition to 37 Motion to Intervene filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., and Defenders of Wildlife shall be filed no later than December 1, 2017, and any reply to the response shall be due no later than December 8, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 09/12/2017.
50
11/07/2017
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay by All Defendants.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
11/07/2017
MOTIONS REFERRED: 50 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay to Judge Granade (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
11/08/2017
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Nicole Beyer on behalf of Sally Jewell, National Marine Fisheries Service, Penny Pritzker, United States Fish and Wildlife Service
52
11/13/2017
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 50 Defendants' Fourth Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. This action is STAYED for an additional ninety (90) days, through February 8, 2018. Defendants' response to amended complaint shall be filed no later than March 1, 2018. Any response in opposition to 37 Motion to Intervene filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., and Defenders of Wildlife shall be filed no later than March 1, 2018, and any reply to the response shall be due no later than March 8, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/13/2017.
53
02/05/2018
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay by All Defendants.
1
Text of Proposed Order
1 Attachment
02/05/2018
MOTIONS REFERRED: 53 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay of Proceedings; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
02/05/2018
ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING 53 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay of Proceedings. This is action is STAYED for an additional sixty (60) days, through April 9, 2018. Defendants' response to amended complaint shall be filed no later than April 30, 2018. Any response in opposition to 37 Motion to Intervene filed by Coastal Conservation League, Black Warrior Riverkeeper, Inc., and Defenders of Wildlife shall be filed no later than April 30, 2018, and any reply to the response shall be due no later than May 7, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade.
55
03/15/2018
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs
56
03/15/2018
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 03/15/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.