State of Alaska v. United States Forest Service et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2016-cv-00018 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
92
05/31/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
93
06/07/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
94
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
06/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
06/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
97
07/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
98
08/03/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
99
08/08/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
100
08/13/2018
Notice (Other)
101
08/29/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
102
08/30/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
103
09/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
104
09/17/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
105
11/09/2018
Summary Judgment
106
11/09/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
107
11/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
108
11/27/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
109
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
110
12/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
111
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
112
03/14/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
113
03/14/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
114
03/28/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
115
03/29/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
116
04/02/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
117
05/02/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
118
05/06/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
119
05/17/2019
Response in Support of Motion
120
05/17/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
121
05/20/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
122
05/20/2019
Order
123
05/20/2019
Certificate of Service
05/24/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.