State of Alaska v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00265 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/08/2018
Complaint
2
11/08/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
11/08/2018
1 - Summons Issued as to USA (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/08/2018
Unissued Summons
5
11/27/2018
Affidavit of Service
6
11/29/2018
Notice of Appearance
7
01/04/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order
8
01/08/2019
Stay
9
01/09/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
10
01/31/2019
Order
11
02/08/2019
Order
12
02/25/2019
Answer to Complaint
13
02/25/2019
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
14
02/28/2019
Scheduling Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.