State of Alaska v. Zinke et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00013 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
129
02/23/2018
ORDER: re Motion to Supplement 110 (see order for full details). Pursuant to this Court's order at Docket 127, the parties shall file a proposed schedule or schedules for summary judgment briefing within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/23/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
139
06/04/2018
Notice (Other)
140
06/08/2018
Stay
141
06/12/2018
~Util - Set/Clear Flags
142
09/10/2018
Response to Order
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
144
12/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
145
12/11/2018
Order
146
01/09/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
01/10/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/10/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
148
01/10/2019
Order
149
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)
03/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/01/2019
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
151
03/15/2019
Stay
152
03/26/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
153
04/01/2019
Withdraw as Attorney
04/02/2019
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.