Stavenjord v. Conant et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00203 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
10/09/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
26
10/09/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
27
10/24/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
28
10/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
29
10/31/2018
Summary Judgment
30
11/13/2018
Notice (Other)
31
11/14/2018
Notice (Other)
11/15/2018
Docket Annotation - Public Officer-Agency (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
11/14/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
33
11/14/2018
Affidavit
34
11/26/2018
Notice (Other)
35
12/06/2018
Leave to File Document
36
12/06/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
37
12/07/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File
38
12/12/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
39
12/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
40
12/19/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
41
12/26/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
42
12/26/2018
Declaration
43
01/02/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
44
02/15/2019
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
45
02/22/2019
Order
46
02/28/2019
Notice (Other)
47
03/18/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
48
03/25/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
04/10/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
04/16/2019
Order
52
04/19/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
05/03/2019
Notice (Other)
05/10/2019
Settlement Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2019
~Util - Set Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.