Stefany Z. Michaela Brummer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00209 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
07/06/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
3
07/06/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
4
07/06/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
5
07/06/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
07/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/06/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
7
07/06/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
8
07/06/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
9
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
07/09/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)
13
07/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
14
07/11/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)
15
07/12/2018
Amended Order (SA)
17
07/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
18
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/19/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.