Stephanie Diane Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-05404 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 188 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/29/2017
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Stephanie Diane Williams
2
12/29/2017
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.
3
12/29/2017
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams
5
12/29/2017
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.
6
12/29/2017
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.
7
12/29/2017
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.
8
12/29/2017
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/01/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/09/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/27/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 03/26/2018.
9
12/31/2017
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 12/31/2017.
10
12/30/2017
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
01/02/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams).
12
01/03/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
13
01/04/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Robert John Fehse Jr Filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance, LLC.
14
01/04/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance, LLC (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.).
15
01/04/2018
Hearing Scheduled (RE: related document(s) 14 Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance, LLC). Hearing scheduled 3/1/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
16
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
17
01/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/04/2018.
18
01/17/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.
19
01/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 01/24/2018. (Ch13troffice, sc)
20
01/29/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, ul)
21
01/29/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/1/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
22
01/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 01/31/2018.
23
02/18/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.
24
02/18/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Lien Avoidance, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.).
25
02/20/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of a Document(RE: related document(s) 14 Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance, LLC (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams.).).
26
02/28/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling (Confirmation Hearing) Hearing scheduled 03/01/2018 at 10:59 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham.
27
03/02/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
28
03/14/2018
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan; The Trustees objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss are withdrawn Signed on 3/14/2018 (RE: related document(s) 14 Withdrawn - Objection to Confirmation of the Plan filed by Creditor TD Auto Finance, LLC, 20 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to File Documents under 521(i), Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss, 24 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Stephanie Diane Williams, Motion to Avoid Lien (CM07), Motion to Assume or Reject Contract/Leases (CM06)).
03/14/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 230.23 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/14/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-05404-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (230.23) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21838988. Fee Amount 230.23 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
03/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 28 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 03/16/2018.
04/11/2018
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 79.77 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(17-05404-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (79.77) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21945736. Fee Amount 79.77 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
04/12/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 11 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.